This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:45:02 (UTC).

Delgado et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Delgado filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul C. Huck. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23925

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul C. Huck

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Giraldo Delgado

Lazaro Lezcano

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Hernandez

Attorney at Azoy Socorro

2020 Ponce De Leon Boulevardste 1008

Coarl Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

Michael Adam Packer

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

100 Ne 3Rd Avenuesuite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons from State Court

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint from State Court

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C United Claims Adjusters Estimate

1 #5

Docket Sheet Docket Sheet from State Court

1 #6

Exhibit Notice of Appearnce State Court Case

1 #7

Exhibit Motion Extension of Time State Court

1 #8

Exhibit Agreed Order Motion Extension State Court

#5

(#5) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Settlement by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified to correct closing date/Date Filed on 1/3/2022 (asl). (Entered: 01/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified to correct closing date/Date Filed on 1/3/2022 (asl). (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Settlement by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (Packer, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Jury demand when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15155985, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons from State Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint from State Court, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C United Claims Adjusters Estimate, #5 Docket Sheet Docket Sheet from State Court, #6 Exhibit Notice of Appearnce State Court Case, #7 Exhibit Motion Extension of Time State Court, #8 Exhibit Agreed Order Motion Extension State Court)(Packer, Michael) Modified Text on 11/8/2021 (drz). ( No Answer, Affirmative Defenses or Motion to Dismiss filed in State Court) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ADAM PACKER