This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2020 at 08:36:05 (UTC).

Delgado et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Delgado filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-60514

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alvaro M. Gomez

Claudia L. Delgado

Defendant

American Medical Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paulina do Amaral

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein

250 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Sarah R. London

Attorney at Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

275 Batter Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3339

Wendy R. Fleishman

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

250 Hudson Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

Chafica Antoinette Singha

Attorney at Singha Law Group

Po Box 56424

St Petersburg, FL 33702

Defendant Attorneys

Erik W. Legg

Attorney at Farrell White & Legg

Po Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Barbara R. Binis

Attorney at Reed Smith

Three Logan Square, Suite 3100, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Michael J. Farrell

Attorney at Farrell White & Legg

Po Box 6457

Huntington, WV 25772-6457

Christina Olivos

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Edward Maurice Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131-2847

 

Court Documents

#99

#97

#96

#94

47 #5

Exhibit 4

47 #3

Exhibit 2

47 #2

Exhibit 1

47 #1

Proposed Order

#47

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

197 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before the Honorable Scott Silverman on July 24, 2020. See attached document for full details. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/8/2020. (mhn) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Clerks Notice to Filer re #97 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Parties/Mediator Not Added. ERROR. The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (lbc) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Scott Silverman Selected/Added American Medical Systems, Inc. as Mediator. (Olivos, Christina) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Calendar Call set for 9/22/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz., Proposed Order Scheduling due by 5/7/2020., Mediation Deadline 7/27/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/3/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/3/2020.). Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (mhn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) PAPERLESS ORDER requiring renewed motions. On or before May 18, 2020, the parties shall refile their Daubert motions referenced in the #94 Prior Rulings Chart. However, each party is limited to filing one Daubert motion. If a party cannot address all evidentiary issues in a 30-page memorandum, it must petition the Court for leave to include additional pages. The parties are reminded that Daubert motions must contain the Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) certification. On or before May 18, 2020, Defendant shall also refile its #47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment indicating it is fully briefed and the docket entries for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition and Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion, respectively. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/16/2020. (mhn) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) STATUS REPORT ADDENDUM re 93 Order Granting #92 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Addendum to #91 Status Report by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Olivos, Christina) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #92 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Addendum to #91 Status Report. The parties may file an addendum to the Status Report on or before April 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/9/2020. (mhn) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) MOTION for Extension of Time to file chart of relevant MDL decisions re #91 Status Report by Claudia L. Delgado. Responses due by 4/22/2020 (Singha, Chafica) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) STATUS REPORT re 78 Paperless Order by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Olivos, Christina) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #89 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. On or before April 9, 2020, the parties shall file the 78 Joint Status Report. No further extensions of time will be permitted absent exigent circumstances. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 4/2/2020. (mhn) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL AMS Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL AMS Inactive") (ts) (ADI) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2325 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2325 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases on inactive docket). (kp) (ADI) (Entered: 03/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and American Medical Systems have reached a settlement with regard to AMS. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and AMS may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 5/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5395 in MDL Case No. 2325 AMS. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/8/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn) (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Claudia L. Delgado, Alvaro M. Gomez. (Fleishman, Wendy) (Entered: 06/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting MOTION by Wendy R. Fleishman of Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein, LLP to have Heather H. Wong withdrawn as counsel filed in MDL 2325. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Heather H. Wong as counsel for plaintiffs, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2325 with which she is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/10/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) (Entered: 05/10/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Sarah R. London on behalf of Claudia L. Delgado, Alvaro M. Gomez. (London, Sarah) (Entered: 05/06/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) (Entered: 08/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 171 (Order Amending Pretrial Order #118, Agreed Order and Stipulation Regarding Protocol for Collection, Preservation, and Division of Pathology Material) entered on 04/23/2014 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) (Entered: 05/02/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3177593. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kg) (Entered: 04/29/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward M. Mullins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Olivos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara R. Binis