This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2021 at 07:08:25 (UTC).

Delgado-Claudio et al v. Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1 et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2021 Delgado-Claudio filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01392

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Delgado Claudio

Aisha M Vazquez Malave

David Delgado-Claudio

Aisha M Vazquez-Malave

Defendants

Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1

Select Portfolio Servicing Inc.

Insurance Companies ABC

John Doe

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Rivera-Velez

Po Box 191059

San Juan, PR 00919

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding request for waiver of service of summons filed by William Rivera-Velez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Velez, William) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1. Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1, et.al. COMPLAINT, filed by David Delgado Claudio, et.al.,re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/24/2021. (arg) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

1 #3

Summons Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

1 #2

Summons Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1

1 #1

Category Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Delgado Claudio, Aisha M Vazquez Malave. Service due by 11/22/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Summons Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1, #3 Summons Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.)(Rivera-Velez, William) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER noted #6 INFORMATIVE motion regarding request for waiver of service of summons filed by William Rivera-Velez on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/15/2021. (jg) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding request for waiver of service of summons filed by William Rivera-Velez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Velez, William) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7424584.) re #1 Complaint, filed by Aisha M Vazquez Malave, David Delgado Claudio, filed by David Delgado Claudio, Aisha M Vazquez Malave. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Aisha M Vazquez Malave, David Delgado Claudio.(Rivera-Velez, William) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1. Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1, et.al. COMPLAINT, filed by David Delgado Claudio, et.al.,re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/24/2021. (arg) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Delgado Claudio, Aisha M Vazquez Malave. Service due by 11/22/2021, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Summons Legacy Mortgage Asset Trust 2019-PR1, #3 Summons Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.)(Rivera-Velez, William) (Entered: 08/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant