This case was last updated from PACER on 11/01/2020 at 08:32:57 (UTC).

Delaware Life Insurance Company v. Cheryl Alexander et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Delaware Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cheryl Alexander. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01667

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delaware Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Cheryl Alexander

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Eric Vanier

Jason Vanier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keiko J Kojima

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew James Knez

Attorney at Knez Law Group LLP

6780 Indiana Avenue Suite 150

Riverside, CA 92506

David Song Shik Chon

Attorney at The Legacy Lawyers PC

10221 Slater Avenue Suite 106

Fountain Valley, CA 92708

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. upon Jason Vanier waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Chon, Attorney for Jason Vanier. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. upon Eric Vanier waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Chon, Attorney for Eric Vanier. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. upon Cheryl Alexander waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew J. Knez, Attorney for Cheryl Alexander. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Cheryl Alexander, Eric Vanier, Jason Vanier. (esa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company, (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27899181 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Delaware Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. upon Jason Vanier waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Chon, Attorney for Jason Vanier. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. upon Eric Vanier waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by David Chon, Attorney for Eric Vanier. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. upon Cheryl Alexander waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Matthew J. Knez, Attorney for Cheryl Alexander. (Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Cheryl Alexander, Eric Vanier, Jason Vanier. (esa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company, (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. (Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27899181 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Delaware Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Daniel W Maguire added to party Delaware Life Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Maguire, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DELAWARE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keiko J Kojima

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Maguire