This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:08:42 (UTC).

Delarmente v. CSAA General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Delarmente filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CSAA General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Regina M Rodriguez and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03147

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Regina M Rodriguez

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leonida Delarmente

Defendants

CSAA General Insurance Company, dba AAA Insurance Company

CSAA General Insurance Company

AAA Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Nathan Balach

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker LLC-Denver

101 West Colfax Avenue, Suite 650

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Christy Noelle Redmond

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkway, Suite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/20/2022. (amont, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#18

(#18) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/20/2022. Discovery due by 8/18/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2022. Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2022. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03147-RMR. (athom, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#13

(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#12

(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Nathan Balach on behalf of Leonida DelarmenteAttorney Adam Nathan Balach added to party Leonida Delarmente(pty:pla) (Balach, Adam) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon CSAA General Insurance Company on 11/1/2021, filed by Plaintiff Leonida Delarmente (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against CSAA General Insurance Company, filed by Leonida Delarmente.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company, dba AAA Insurance CompanyAttorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party CSAA General Insurance Company, dba AAA Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

1 #11

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit D-Secretary of State Periodic Report

1 #7

Exhibit C-Traffic Accident Report

1 #6

Exhibit B-Registered Voter Information

1 #5

Exhibit A-State Court Return of Service

1 #4

Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order

1 #3

Exhibit A-State Court Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/20/2022. (amont, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 1/20/2022. Discovery due by 8/18/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2022. Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2022. FTR: Courtroom C-201. (amont, ) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER Due to a technical issue with the conference line, the telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 1/20/2022 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The dial-in information remains the same. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/18/2022. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M Rodriguez on 1/13/2022. Text Only Entry (rmrja) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03147-RMR. (athom, ) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03147-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (csarr, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company. (Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to ECF doc. 9, the parties were ordered to file a proposed scheduling order and completed consent form by 1/11/2022. The docket indicates that neither have been filed. It is therefore ORDERED that parties file a proposed scheduling order and email a WORD copy to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, no later than 1/13/2022. A completed consent form shall also be filed by 1/13/2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/12/2022. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam Nathan Balach on behalf of Leonida DelarmenteAttorney Adam Nathan Balach added to party Leonida Delarmente(pty:pla) (Balach, Adam) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#9) Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 1-18-2022 at 11:00 am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, 7 days before the Telephonic Scheduling Conference (on or before 1-11-2022). The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#7] is due _1-11-2022. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2022 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12-2-2022. Text Only Entry (skclc2). (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by CSAA General Insurance Company.(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon CSAA General Insurance Company on 11/1/2021, filed by Plaintiff Leonida Delarmente (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against CSAA General Insurance Company, filed by Leonida Delarmente.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Kirsten Wagner on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company, dba AAA Insurance CompanyAttorney Rebecca Kirsten Wagner added to party CSAA General Insurance Company, dba AAA Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CSAA General Insurance Company, dba AAA Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021CV33390. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8190313), filed by CSAA General Insurance Company, dba AAA Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A-State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit A-State Court Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit A-State Court Return of Service, #6 Exhibit B-Registered Voter Information, #7 Exhibit C-Traffic Accident Report, #8 Exhibit D-Secretary of State Periodic Report, #9 State Court Register of Actions, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Redmond, Christy) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AAA INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christy Noelle Redmond