This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2020 at 11:15:20 (UTC).

Delaney v. Baker

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 Delaney filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11154

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent Delaney

Defendant

Charles D Baker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas O. Mason

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas O. Mason

19 Wells Place

Lynn, MA 01902

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Spector

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

One Ashburton Place, Room 2019

Boston, MA 02108-1698

Douglas S. Martland

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

18Th Floor, One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion. (Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#19

(#19) MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) filed by Charles D Baker. (Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#18

(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charles D Baker.(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles D Baker.(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#15

(#15) Assented to MOTION to Dismiss Count III, Count IV Partially and Count V Partially by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Vincent Delaney. (Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Modified on 7/31/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Withdraw #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency filed by Vincent Delaney. (Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#2

(#11) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2020 11:00 AM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #7

6

1 #6

5

1 #5

4

1 #4

2 & 3

1 #3

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Category Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8290431 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Vincent Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 2 & 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6)(Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Preliminary Injunction Motion. (Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION) filed by Charles D Baker. (Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charles D Baker.(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles D Baker.(Spector, Amy) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Assented to MOTION to Dismiss Count III, Count IV Partially and Count V Partially by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Vincent Delaney. (Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Modified on 7/31/2020 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Withdraw #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2020 11:00 AM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Joint Motion Submitting Scheduling Stipulation. Stipulation is approved. Motion hearing to be set for September 2, 2020 at 11:00 by video. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION Joint Scheduling Stipulation by Charles D Baker.(Martland, Douglas) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas S. Martland on behalf of Charles D Baker (Martland, Douglas) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Spector on behalf of Charles D Baker (Spector, Amy) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vincent Delaney. Charles D Baker waiver sent on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Charles D Baker. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency filed by Vincent Delaney. (Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency by Vincent Delaney.(Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8290431 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Vincent Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 2 & 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6)(Mason, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less