This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 07:47:10 (UTC).

Del Tufo v. Owens Illinois, et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Del Tufo filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Owens Illinois. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-60003

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ethel Del Tufo

Del Tufo, Joseph, Estate of

Defendants

KEENE CORPORATION

Inc. Owens-Illinois

OWENS-ILLINOIS GLASS COMPANY

OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP

W.R. GRACE & COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT J. BRADLEY

Attorney at THORNTON LAW FIRM LLP

100 Summer Street, 30Th Floor

Boston, MA 02111

Defendant Attorneys

LAWRENCE G. CETRULO

Attorney at CETRULO & CAPONE

Two Seaport Lane, 10Th Fl, Exchange Place

Boston, MA 02110

PETER J. RUBIN

Attorney at BERNSTEIN, SHUR, SAWYER AND NELSON

100 Middle Street, P.O. Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-9729

THOMAS J. CALLAHAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS J. CALLAHAN

24 Jewel Road, P.O. Box 316

Holbrook, MA 02343

BRUCE G. TUCKER

Attorney at LEGAL MGT SERV LLC

300 Centerville Rd Ste 304S

Warwick, RI 02886

ROBERT S. KUTNER

Attorney at CASNER & EDWARDS LLP

303 Congress St, 2Nd Fl

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1253 in MDL Case 875 received from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. This case is transferred pursuant to Administrative Order No. 11, entered in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on August 15, 2006. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

2 #2

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

2 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a)(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT ANY RESPONSES TO THE MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FRCP 60(a) SHALL BE FILED BY 11/4/21. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 10/28/21. 10/28/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 60(a)(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:86-cv-03590. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1253 in MDL Case 875 received from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. This case is transferred pursuant to Administrative Order No. 11, entered in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania on August 15, 2006. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/1996
  • DocketTerminated document [0-1] motion to dismiss , pursuant to Transfer Order. (vah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/28/1996)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/1994
  • DocketAssented to motion by W.R. Grace & Company to dismiss , filed. See Document #6874 in MML#1, MML#2, filed. Individual copies provided, and docketed in each case. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 12/26/1995)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/1994
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of attorney Thomas J. Callahan for Owens-Corning Fiberglas, filed. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/1994)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/1992
  • DocketJudge Charles R. Weiner. Order of Dismissal entered in MDL-875 on 9/18/92. "...cases are dismissed without prejudice..." See Document #6805 in MML 1, MML 2. Copies sent to Liaison Counsel. (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/1993)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/1992
  • DocketMotion by Del Tufo, Joseph, Es, Ethel Del Tufo, Owens-Corning to dismiss Owens Corning Fiberglas (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6778) (lmh) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/1992)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/1991
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania, per July 29, 1991 transfer order of Multidistrict Litigation Panel in In Re: asbestos litigation (MDL-875). Case closed. (vah) Modified on 11/19/1991 [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 11/13/1991)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/1991
  • DocketMotion by Ethel Del Tufo, Del Tufo, Joseph, Es, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Owens-Illinois Glass to dismiss Owens-Illinois, Inc. and Owens-Illinois Glass Co (SEE MML #1 & #2, #6772) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 08/10/1992)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/1991
  • DocketMotion by Del Tufo, Joseph, Es, Keene Corporation to dismiss Keene Corporation (SEE MML #1-5, #6684) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 08/06/1992)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/1991
  • DocketJudge Rya W. Zobel . Endorsed Order granting [0-1] motion to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/1993)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/1991
  • DocketMotion by Owens Corning Fiberg to dismiss. (See MML #1, & #2, #6623) (fmr) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 10/27/2021.] (Entered: 01/29/1993)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OWENS-CORNING FIEVERGLAS CO is a litigant

Latest cases where Keene is a litigant

Latest cases where WR GRACE & CO is a litigant