This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 07:59:58 (UTC).

DeKrey v. Bayer Cropscience LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 DeKrey filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer Cropscience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00744

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brad DeKrey

Defendants

Corteva, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.

Cargill Incorporated

BASF Corporation

Tenkoz Inc.

CHS Inc.

Growmark Inc.

Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Univar Solutions, Inc.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Syngenta Corporation

Growmark FS, LLC

Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hart L. Robinovitch

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN REED PLLP - Scottsdale

14646 N. Kierland Blvd, Suite 145

Scottsdale, AZ 85254

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin W. Hulse

Attorney at BLACKWELL BURKE PA

431 S. Seventh Street, Suite 2500

Minneapolis, MN 55415

X. Kevin Zhao

Attorney at GREENE ESPEL PLLP

222 South Ninth Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David J. Lender

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL LLP - New York

767 Fifth Avenue, Concourse

New York, NY 10153

Lara Bach

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL LLP - Miami

1395 Brickell Ave., Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Mary Fee

Attorney at FREDRIKSON AND BYRON PA

200 S. Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1425

Todd A Wind

Attorney at FREDRIKSON AND BYRON PA

200 S. Sixth Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1425

Brandon J. Wheeler

Attorney at FELHABER LARSON PA

220 South 6Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4504

David L Hashmall

Attorney at FELHABER LARSON PA

220 South 6Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4504

Kathy Osborn

300 N. Meridian St., Ste. 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jaime Stilson

Attorney at DORSEY AND WHITNEY LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

F Matthew Ralph

50 S. Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Michael A Lindsay

50 S. Sixth Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498

Luke Westerman

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP - Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 4100

Denver, CO 80203

Jon M. Woodruff

Attorney at STINSON LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Peter J Schwingler

Attorney at STINSON LLP - Minneapolis

50 S. 6Th St., Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jonathan C Miesen

4001 Lexington Ave N

Arden Hills, MN 55126

Richard G Jensen

Attorney at FABYANSKE AND WESTRA PA

333 South Seventh Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jevon Bindman

Attorney at MASLON LLP

90 S. Seventh Street, 3300 Wells Fargo Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1254

James J. Long

Attorney at BRIGGS AND MORGAN

332 Minnesota Street, 2200 First National Bank Building

St. Paul, MN 55101

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#79

78 #1

*Restricted*

#78

#77

#75

#71

#70

#67

#64

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mary Fee ;attorney/firm Mary Fee by Defendant BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00639. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk.(MMP) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) TEXT-ONLY ORDER in Response to #75 Letter to Magistrate Judge. With the permission of presiding District Judge Michael J. Davis, and in response to #75 the parties' letter reflecting their agreement and intention that Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. was to be added as a defendant in this matter with the filing of the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Defendant Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. as a defendant in this matter. This matter remains stayed pursuant to #70 the May 5, 2021 Order of Judge Davis staying all proceedings and deadlines, including but not limited to the filing of additional motions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/26/2021. (EB) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brad DeKrey . (Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #64 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Adam C. Hemlock for BASF Corporation.; granting #67 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David J. Lender for BASF Corporation.; granting #71 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lara Bach for BASF Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathy Osborn for CHS Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/6/2021. (JGK) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#72) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael L. McCluggage and Barack S. Echols as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lara Bach. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8729680 filed by BASF Corporation. (Fee, Mary) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of Federated Co-Operatives Ltd.. (Hulse, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/15/2021. (HAM) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Motion to Extend Response Deadlines #7 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Lindsay, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc.. (Lindsay, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson, Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-639 (MJD/TNL). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/8/2021.(MMP) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hart L. Robinovitch, E. Powell Miller, Sharon S. Almonrode, William Kalas, Dennis A. Lienhardt as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMG) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC. (MMG) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 21-cv-639 SRN/BRT. (MMG) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer Cropscience LP, Bayer Cropscience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill Incorporated, Corteva, Inc., Federated Co-Operatives Ltd., Growmark FS, LLC, Growmark Inc., Nutrien AG Solutions Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz, Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8575870) filed by Brad DeKrey. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cialkowski, David) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenkoz Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GROWMARK, Inc. is a litigant