This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/16/2022 at 09:26:55 (UTC).

DeJesus v. Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 DeJesus filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04316

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina DeJesus

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Abbott Laboratories Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Paul Matthews

Attorney at Matthews & Associates

2905 Sackett Street

Houston, TX 77098

Yvette Diaz

Attorney at Freese & Goss, PLLC

3500 Maple Avenue, Ste 1100

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Bridget Kathleen O'Connor

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Meir Feder

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281-1047

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tina DeJesus (Matthews, David) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#21

(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Abbott Laboratories on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Mead Johnson Nutrition Company on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Mead Johnson & Company LLC on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Abbott Laboratories Inc on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tina DeJesus by David Paul Matthews (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#15

(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tina DeJesus by Yvette Diaz (Diaz, Yvette) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#14

(#14) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

13 #1

*Restricted*

13 #13

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tina DeJesus (Matthews, David) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Meir Feder (Feder, Meir) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor (O'Connor, Bridget) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Abbott Laboratories on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Mead Johnson Nutrition Company on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Mead Johnson & Company LLC on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina DeJesus as to Abbott Laboratories Inc on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tina DeJesus by David Paul Matthews (Matthews, David) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tina DeJesus by Yvette Diaz (Diaz, Yvette) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Paul Matthews re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading (Tina Dejesus with party text "Individually") were not entered on CM ECF.. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tina DeJesus..(Matthews, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tina DeJesus..(Matthews, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abbott Laboratories, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tina DeJesus..(Matthews, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abbott Laboratories, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tina DeJesus..(Matthews, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Matthews, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Mead Johnson Nutrition Company, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26459844)Document filed by Tina DeJesus..(Matthews, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/17/2022.] (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget Kathleen O'Connor