This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2020 at 09:04:13 (UTC).

DEGEORGE v. MARINCOLA et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 DEGEORGE filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against MARINCOLA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-05594

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arthur DeGeorge

Defendants

BOROUGH OF BELMAR

John Marincola

In Re

ARTHUR A. DEGEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and In Re Attorney

RICHARD C. BRYAN

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner

155 Gaither Drive ,Suite B

Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054

Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT IAN SEGAL

71 North Main Street

Medford, NJ 08055

W. ROBB GRAHAM

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT I. SEGAL, P.A.

71 North Main Street

Medford, NJ 08055-8802

 

Court Documents

4 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#4

(#4) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ARTHUR A. DEGEORGE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(BRYAN, RICHARD) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

3 #4

Certificate of Service

3 #3

Text of Proposed Order

3 #2

Exhibit Photos showing line on dock

3 #1

Brief Claimants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Petition of Arthur Degeorge

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by JOHN MARINCOLA. Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Claimants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Petition of Arthur Degeorge, #2 Exhibit Photos showing line on dock, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(GRAHAM, W.) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

2 #1

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by W. ROBB GRAHAM on behalf of JOHN MARINCOLA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GRAHAM, W.) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Marincola ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10778841), filed by Arthur DeGeorge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(BRYAN, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ARTHUR A. DEGEORGE re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(BRYAN, RICHARD) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6). Motion set for 7/6/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Petition Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by JOHN MARINCOLA. Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief Claimants Motion to Dismiss the Complaint and Petition of Arthur Degeorge, #2 Exhibit Photos showing line on dock, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(GRAHAM, W.) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by W. ROBB GRAHAM on behalf of JOHN MARINCOLA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GRAHAM, W.) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Marincola ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10778841), filed by Arthur DeGeorge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(BRYAN, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BOROUGH OF BELMAR is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD C. BRYAN