This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2022 at 09:33:16 (UTC).

DeForest v. Lumpkin

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 DeForest filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Lumpkin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02984

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Charles William DeForest

Beaumont, TX 77705

Respondent

Bobby Lumpkin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Edward Larry Marshall

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

Sarah Miranda Harp

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Charles William DeForest.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles William DeForest, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2022. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#5

(#5) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Charles William DeForest, filed.(DMcKinnieRichardson, 4) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO ANSWER. Answer due for Bobby Lumpkin 1/13/2023; #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#7

(#7) OBJECTIONS to #6 Order to Answer, filed by Charles William DeForest. (AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Harp on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin, filed. (Harp, Sarah) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#10

(#10) Letter from Charles DeForest re: filing fee, filed. (AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter from Charles DeForest re: filing fee, filed. (AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Harp on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin, filed. (Harp, Sarah) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles William DeForest, filed. (AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OBJECTIONS to #6 Order to Answer, filed by Charles William DeForest. (AkeitaMichael, 4) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO ANSWER. Answer due for Bobby Lumpkin 1/13/2023; #2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is DENIED. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Charles William DeForest, filed.(DMcKinnieRichardson, 4) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Charles William DeForest, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles William DeForest, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/22/2022. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Charles William DeForest.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Miranda Harp

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Larry Marshall