This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2020 at 11:00:36 (UTC).

Deep Web L.L.C. v. Ask Media Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Deep Web L L C filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ask Media Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02262

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deep Web L.L.C.

Defendant

Ask Media Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

Defendant Attorneys

Evan N. Budaj

Attorney at Singer Cashman LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Suite 1950

San Francisco, CA 94111

Benjamin Laban Singer

Attorney at Singer Cashman LLP

601 Montgomery Street, Suite 1950

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#17

16 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#16

#15

14 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#14

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Hao Ni. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Hao Ni (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14505364) filed by Deep Web L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ni, Hao) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/13/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ask Media Group, LLC.. (Budaj, Evan) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint (Civ. L.R. 6-1) filed by Ask Media Group, LLC. (Budaj, Evan) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Evan N. Budaj (Budaj, Evan) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Laban Singer (Singer, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/12/2020) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Deep Web L.L.C. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Ask Media Group, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re-file as Proposed SummonsThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Affidavit of Service filed by Deep Web L.L.C. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Request for Issuance of Summons served on N/A on N/A, filed by Deep Web L.L.C.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/3/2020) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding PATENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Ask Media Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14339192.). Filed byDeep Web L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASK Media Group, LLC f/k/a IAC Publishing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hao Ni

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin