Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:57:03 (UTC).

DEEMER et al v. RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 DEEMER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter J. Phipps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00297

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Phipps

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCIS N. BLANK

ALICE S. MURPHY

HELEN A. PODISH

MARK D. MURPHY

JANE KERN DEEMER

Defendant

RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J. Burnett

Attorney at Houston Harbaugh

401 Liberty Avenue, 22Nd Floor, Three Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-1005

Brendan A. O'Donnell

Attorney at Houston Harbaugh, P.C.

Three Gateway Center, 22Nd Floor, 401 Liberty Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin C. Abbott

Attorney at Reed Smith

225 Fifth Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-2716

Justin H. Werner

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

225 Fifth Ave, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Notice of Mediation by LOUIS B. KUSHNER. Mediation Date July 16, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Kushner, Louis) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Louis B. Kushner is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 07/16/19. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 06/21/19. (eca) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 05/20/19; Amended Pleadings due by 06/28/19; Joinder of Parties due 06/28/19; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 05/15/19; Expert Reports due by 11/08/19; Rebuttal Reports due by 01/07/20; Discovery due by 02/07/20; Discovery limitations outlined herein; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference scheduled for 02/12/20 at 2:30 PM; Summary Judgment due by 04/01/20; Cross-Motion/Response to Summary Judgment due by 05/13/20; Response/Reply brief due by 06/12/20; Reply due by 06/30/20; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 05/10/19. (eca) Modified text on 5/14/2019. (ksa) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#13

(#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter J. Phipps: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/10/2019. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by FRANCIS N. BLANK, JANE KERN DEEMER, ALICE S. MURPHY, MARK D. MURPHY, HELEN A. PODISH. (Burnett, Robert) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Burnett, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 05/10/19 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Peter J. Phipps. Rule 26(f) Report due by 04/30/19, Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 05/03/19. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 03/26/19. (eca) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying 1. Range Resources Corporation as corporate parent and Range Resources-Pine Mountain, Inc. as other affiliate, by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) Modified text on 3/26/2019. (ksa) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan A. O'Donnell on behalf of FRANCIS N. BLANK, JANE KERN DEEMER, ALICE S. MURPHY, MARK D. MURPHY, HELEN A. PODISH. (O'Donnell, Brendan) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Burnett on behalf of FRANCIS N. BLANK, JANE KERN DEEMER, ALICE S. MURPHY, MARK D. MURPHY, HELEN A. PODISH. (Burnett, Robert) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin H. Werner on behalf of RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 2 Declaration of Erin McDowell

1 #3

Exhibit 1 Complaint Part 2

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County, case number 698 of 2019 Copies attached: Complaint and Declaration of Erin McDowell (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5066864), filed by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Complaint Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Erin McDowell) (ksa) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Notice of Mediation by LOUIS B. KUSHNER. Mediation Date July 16, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Kushner, Louis) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Louis B. Kushner is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 07/16/19. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 06/21/19. (eca) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 05/20/19; Amended Pleadings due by 06/28/19; Joinder of Parties due 06/28/19; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 05/15/19; Expert Reports due by 11/08/19; Rebuttal Reports due by 01/07/20; Discovery due by 02/07/20; Discovery limitations outlined herein; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference scheduled for 02/12/20 at 2:30 PM; Summary Judgment due by 04/01/20; Cross-Motion/Response to Summary Judgment due by 05/13/20; Response/Reply brief due by 06/12/20; Reply due by 06/30/20; Page limitations outlined herein. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 05/10/19. (eca) Modified text on 5/14/2019. (ksa) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter J. Phipps: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 5/10/2019. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Abbott, Kevin) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FRANCIS N. BLANK, JANE KERN DEEMER, ALICE S. MURPHY, MARK D. MURPHY, HELEN A. PODISH. (Burnett, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by FRANCIS N. BLANK, JANE KERN DEEMER, ALICE S. MURPHY, MARK D. MURPHY, HELEN A. PODISH. (Burnett, Robert) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Burnett, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#8) ORDER OF COURT. By May 6, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 04/15/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 05/10/19 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Peter J. Phipps. Rule 26(f) Report due by 04/30/19, Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 05/03/19. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 03/26/19. (eca) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement identifying 1. Range Resources Corporation as corporate parent and Range Resources-Pine Mountain, Inc. as other affiliate, by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) Modified text on 3/26/2019. (ksa) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan A. O'Donnell on behalf of FRANCIS N. BLANK, JANE KERN DEEMER, ALICE S. MURPHY, MARK D. MURPHY, HELEN A. PODISH. (O'Donnell, Brendan) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Burnett on behalf of FRANCIS N. BLANK, JANE KERN DEEMER, ALICE S. MURPHY, MARK D. MURPHY, HELEN A. PODISH. (Burnett, Robert) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin H. Werner on behalf of RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Werner, Justin) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney Abbott advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 3/26/2019. (ksa) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County, case number 698 of 2019 Copies attached: Complaint and Declaration of Erin McDowell (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5066864), filed by RANGE RESOURCES-APPALACHIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 Complaint Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Complaint Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Erin McDowell) (ksa) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less