This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:26:52 (UTC).

DeCosta v. Headway Workforce Solutions

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 DeCosta filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Headway Workforce Solutions. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH J. MANSFIELD and LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hawaii District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

KENNETH J. MANSFIELD

Presiding Judge

LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Ilim DeCosta

Volcano, HI 96785

Defendant

Headway Workforce Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Andrew L. Pepper

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

1088 Bishop Street, Suite- 4100

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Headway Workforce Solutions from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, case number 3CCV-19-0000105. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2315765), filed by Headway Workforce Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Headway Workforce Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Headway Workforce Solutions. (Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 2/10/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Andrea Ilima DeCosta shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 10, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A

5 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 2/10/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Andrea Ilima DeCosta shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 10, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • (#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00015 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Andrea Ilima DeCosta shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 10, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Headway Workforce Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Headway Workforce Solutions. (Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Headway Workforce Solutions from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, case number 3CCV-19-0000105. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2315765), filed by Headway Workforce Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.