This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2022 at 08:49:31 (UTC).

Decor Holdings, Inc., et al. et al v. Ryniker

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 Decor Holdings, Inc filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Ryniker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary R. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06725

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary R. Brown

 

Party Details

Appellant

Sumec Textile Company Limited

Appellee

bryan Ryniker

In Re

Decor Holdings, Inc., et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Mark Allen Frankel

Attorney at Bakcenroth Frankel & Krinsky, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Scott Krinsky

Attorney at Backenroth, Frankel & Krinsky, LLP

800 Third Avenue, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Frederick B Rosner

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group, LLC

824 N. Market St, Ste 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Schuyler Carroll

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

345 Park Avenue, 21St Floor

New York, NY 10154

Noah Weingarten

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb LLP

345 Park Avenue, Ste 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10154

 

Court Documents

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

8 #12

*Restricted*

8 #11

*Restricted*

8 #10

*Restricted*

8 #9

*Restricted*

8 #8

Document 18 -21-cv-06725- Transmittal

8 #6

Docket # 22-21-cv-06725- Transmittal-2

8 #5

Docket # 15-21-cv-06725- Transmittal-3

8 #3

Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP: Notice Recipients

8 #2

Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP

8 #1

Amended Designations

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. Appellant's proposed order granting stay pending appeal in consideration of a cash security with the Court Registry, see DE 11-1, is hereby So Ordered. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7067, SUMEC, or its affiliate S Cheer Hk Co. Limited, is directed to deposit the sum of: (i) $693,048.84, representing the full amount of the Default Judgment plus (ii) two years of post-judgment interest accrued from and after the date of the Default Judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1961 in the amount of $1,108.88, totaling $694,157.72 (the "Cash Security") with the Registry of this Court for the purpose of obtaining a stay of all Enforcement Actions pending entry of a Final Order on the Appeal. SUMEC, or its affiliate S Cheer Hk Co. Limited, shall initiate the outgoing wire in the amount of the Cash Security within seven business (7) days from the later of (i) entry of this Order and (ii) receipt of wire instructions from the Clerk.A signed copy of the Stay Order, DE 11-1, will be mailed to counsel at the addresses on record.So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/13/2022. c/ecf (Tahbaz, Joseph) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 Letter MOTION to Stay //Letter Motion Requesting Entry of Order Authorizing Appellant to Post Cash Security with the Court's Registry for Stay Pending Appeal filed by Sumec Textile Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Letter MOTION to Stay //Letter Motion Requesting Entry of Order Authorizing Appellant to Post Cash Security with the Court's Registry for Stay Pending Appeal filed by bryan Ryniker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Weingarten, Noah) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketORDER: Should Appellee oppose Appellant's Letter Motion requesting entry of an order authorizing Appellant to post cash security for a stay pending appeal, Appellee is directed to file a response by close of business today. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/11/2022. c/ecf (Tahbaz, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter MOTION to Stay //Letter Motion Requesting Entry of Order Authorizing Appellant to Post Cash Security with the Court's Registry for Stay Pending Appeal by Sumec Textile Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are advised that the stipulated briefing schedule ordered by the Court on December 8, 2021 remains in effect. See DE 3. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/4/2022. c/ecf (Tahbaz, Joseph) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Bankruptcy Record Received. Notice to all parties, in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), that the record has been received or is available electronically. Parties shall now follow briefing schedule as set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Specifically, appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days of this notice, the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants brief, and the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellees brief, but a reply brief must be filed at least 7 days before scheduled argument. CASE NO: 82008130reg (Attachments: #1 Amended Designations, #2 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP, #3 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (AP: Notice Recipients) (Tirado, Chelsea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2022: #4 Docket # 25-21-cv-06725- Transmittal-4, #5 Docket # 15-21-cv-06725- Transmittal-3, #6 Docket # 22-21-cv-06725- Transmittal-2, #8 Document 18 -21-cv-06725- Transmittal, #9 Transcript Hrg held on 06-16-2021, #10 Transcript Hrg held on 10-27-2021, #11 Transcript Hrg held on 11-22-2021) (Florio, Lisa). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2022: #12 Transcript hrg held on 05-5-21) (Florio, Lisa). (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Document / Motion For Leave To File A Sur-Reply In Opposition To Motion For Stay Pending Appeal Without Posting Bond by bryan Ryniker. (Weingarten, Noah) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment on a Bankruptcy Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, filed by Sumec Textile Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment on a Bankruptcy Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, / DECLARTATION OF NOAH WEINGARTEN filed by bryan Ryniker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bankruptcy Court Judgment, #2 Exhibit 2 - Bankruptcy Court Order Denying Motion to Vacate Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3 - Bankruptcy Court Supplemental Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #4 Exhibit 4 - Bankruptcy Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Appointment of Litigation Administrator, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plan Confirmation Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Adversary Proceeding Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Service of Summons and Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 - Sumec's Proof of Claim, #10 Exhibit 10 - Emails Between August 2020 and January 2021, #11 Exhibit 11 - Litigation Administrator's Request for Entry of Default, #12 Exhibit 12 - Emails Between February and March 2021, #13 Exhibit 13 - Sumec's Motion to Vacate Default Judgment, #14 Exhibit 14 - Litigation Administrator's First Set of Interrogatories, #15 Exhibit 15 - Emails Dated September 2021, #16 Exhibit 16 - Sumec's Responses and Objections to Interrogatories, #17 Exhibit 17 - Emails Dated October 2021, #18 Exhibit 18 - Emails Dated December 2021, #19 Exhibit 19 - Litigation Administrator's Motion to Compel) (Weingarten, Noah) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment on a Bankruptcy Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, filed by bryan Ryniker. (Weingarten, Noah) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER re #3 . The parties' joint proposed briefing schedule is hereby So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/8/2021. c/ecf (Tahbaz, Joseph) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Scheduling Order //Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule by Sumec Textile Company Limited (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment on a Bankruptcy Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, by Sumec Textile Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P) (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. USBC No. 8-20-08130-reg. (Corsini, Alexander) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 8-20-08130-reg., filed by Sumec Textile Company Limited. (Attachments: #1 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #27-1(Related Order), #2 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #33-2(Exhibit), #3 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #33-3(Exhibit), #4 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #35-1(Main), #5 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #35-2(USBC Docket), #6 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #35-5(Civil Cover Sheet), #7 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #35-4(Notice of Appeal Recipients), #8 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #33-4(417A Form), #9 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #33-6(Notice of Recipients), #10 8-20-08130-reg-USBC Doc #35-3(Transmital of Notice of Appeal)) (Corsini, Alexander) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schuyler Carroll