This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/07/2022 at 09:28:31 (UTC).

Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. WHP Plus, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Deckers Outdoor Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against WHP Plus, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05548

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deckers Outdoor Corporation

Defendants

WHP Plus, LLC

DOES 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie Fountain

Brent H Blakely

Defendant Attorneys

Brian K. Brookey

Alexander Kaplan

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33766881 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Jamie Fountain added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, identifying None. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant WHP Plus, LLC. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant WHP Plus, LLC served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Service Leader in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#11

(#11) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#12

(#12) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to WHP Plus, LLC answer now due 9/30/2022, filed by Defendant WHP Plus, LLC.(Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party WHP Plus, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

13 #13

Main Document

13 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT WHP PLUS, LLC

#14

(#14) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT WHP PLUS, LLC'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3), #13 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, hereby ORDERS that: Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the initial Complaint shall be extended from September 30 to October 31, 2022. (es) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#15

(#15) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 12/5/2022 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/28/2022. (lb) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 12/5/2022 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 11/28/2022. (lb) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT WHP PLUS, LLC'S TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3), #13 by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, hereby ORDERS that: Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the initial Complaint shall be extended from September 30 to October 31, 2022. (es) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2022 filed by Defendant WHP Plus, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT WHP PLUS, LLCS TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3))(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to WHP Plus, LLC answer now due 9/30/2022, filed by Defendant WHP Plus, LLC.(Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party WHP Plus, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant WHP Plus, LLC served on 8/10/2022, answer due 8/31/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Service Leader in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant WHP Plus, LLC. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, identifying None. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33766881 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Jamie Fountain added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less