This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:07:07 (UTC).

Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Deckers Outdoor Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07581

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deckers Outdoor Corporation

Defendant

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jake Michael Christensen

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 S Wacker Drive, #2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Isaku Begert

Attorney at Greer, Burns And Crain, Ltd.

300 S Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/14/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 1/14/2020. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #37 is granted. Order to follow. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#41

(#41) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#40

(#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #37 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/14/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

38 #2

Exhibit 1

38 #1

Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio

#38

(#38) MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #37 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#37

(#37) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #3

Schedule A

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 12/27/2019 (jh, ). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/14/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 1/14/2020. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default #37 is granted. Order to follow. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #37 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 1/14/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #37 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/18/2019: Motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. The status hearing set for 12/20/2019 is vacated and reset to 2/20/2020 at 9:30 AM. (mk) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 12/27/2019 (jh, ). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Docket Text Modified on 12/27/2019 (jh, ). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16447697. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less