This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:44:31 (UTC).

Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Deckers Outdoor Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05865

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deckers Outdoor Corporation

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Henan Bering Industries Co., Ltd.

Yiwu Dike Trade Co., Ltd.

Guangzhou Gull Road Trade Co., Ltd.

Hengshui Yue Pin Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd.

Luoyang Zhuohui Shoes Co., Ltd.

Nangong Otelon Fur Products Co., Ltd.

Zaoqiang County Sanhe Fur Business Department

shop2336233 store

manni999 Store

gkul Store

Design t-shirt Store

ZKH Store

shirtstrade666 Store

print 03 Store

Bersa Store

fang-peijie

Newbely

Baiyun District Shuzeng Trading

184 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr.Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drivesuite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#38

(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/13/2021. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#37

(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic status and motion hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel appeared telephonically. Defendants did not appear. Plaintiff's motion for entry of preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. In addition, is a link to video instructions for Plaintiff to view on how to Add Terminate Party https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Videos.aspx?folder=_cmecf&play=Add_Terminate.mp4Telephonic status hearing set for 1/27/22 at 9:30am. Parties shall call 866-434-5269 and the access code is 3751971. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#36

(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On the court's own motion, telephonic status and motion hearing set for 12/6/21 is stricken and re-set to 12/13/21 at 9:30am. Counsel shall call 866-434-5269; access code 3751971. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#35

(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion for entry of preliminary injunction #31 is set for 12/6/21 at 9:30am to coincide with the telephonic status hearing already set for that date. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

34 #1

Declaration of Martin F. Trainor

#34

(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#33

(#33) NOTICE by Deckers Outdoor Corporation re MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for preliminary injunction #31 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#32

(#32) MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for preliminary injunction #31 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#31

(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 12/15/2021 (jg, ). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: Henan Bering Industries Co., Ltd., Yiwu Dike Trade Co., Ltd., Guangzhou Gull Road Trade Co., Ltd., Hengshui Yue Pin Import And Export Trade Co., Ltd., Luoyang Zhuohui Shoes Co., Ltd., Nangong Otelon Fur Products Co., Ltd., Zaoqiang County Sanhe Fur Business Department, shop2336233 store, manni999 Store, gkul Store, Design t-shirt Store, ZKH Store, shirtstrade666 Store, print 03 Store, Bersa Store, fang-peijie, Newbely, Baiyun District Shuzeng Trading, hainantongchengmaoyiyouxiangongsi-15, YLBHDWCGN, wulianxianxinhuashicaiyouxiangongsi, wfh31, wfh38, wfh44, WSDSPO, Carol Caldwell, Elmer Hollie, Tyrone Nguyen, Darlene kwasniewski, Tracy Su, Thomassmgl, teeteightvju, Diane Maxwell, Rosemary R Thibodeaux, lbpgihkn, Variedades Yuli, wupeng Store, xulijie Store, renjunhui Store, lixiaoping Store, liyanping Store me, Linglini, Angdone, ZHANGYANI33588, francisk, Karkadooptec, Rigaruecking, Emersoncheu, Baconsqu, Kilbazar, Stokedavi, Superherom, zhenxiaojie2618, songxinyu59571, pandongyang88042, xiaochunjiang1692, wangxinyue32715, yudeming68818, zhangmengge73353, dfgjxzzs, qianchenchen95012, zhuangzhnegwei20600, chenglin40471, guoyonggang16751, wanglongyu20593, lexiaohu48186, liuchengwu83762, ganggangmuren61637, wangxinrui77931, duanfuqing07253, hezhenze5135, jing929a.myfunpinpin.com, mountainstealstore.com, rbv-store.com, ugg-boots.top, uggbootsromania.com, uggbutiksverige.com, uggcolombia.com, uggdemo.com, uggitaly.site, uggmagyarorszag.com, uggmexicomx.com, uggnzonline.top, uggonlinecanberra.com, ugg-outlet.shop, uggoutletstorede.com, uggsale.top, uggsnzoutlet.com, uggsoutletportugal.com, uggssingapore.com, uggsverige.com, ugg-turkiye.net, hakaoneone.com, hoaksalesingapore.com, hokabondiclearance.com, hokabrasil.com, hokabrasil.org, hoka-ca.com, hokacliftonsingapore.com, hokadanmark.com, hokafinland.com, hoka-hungary.com, hokaieftini.com, hoka-india.com, hokamexicotiendas.com, hokanearme.online, hokanew.store, hokaonebrasil.com, hokaoneclearance.com, hokaoneoneclearance.com, hokaoneonecolombia.com, hokaoneonecomprar.com, hokaoneoneenmexico.com, hokaoneonelojas.com, hokaoneoneonsale.com, hokaoneoneromania.org, hokaoneone-singapore.com, hoka-one-onesingapore.com, hokaoneoneswitzerland.com, hokaoneoneuksale.com, hokaoneonevip.online, hokaonetilbud.com, hokaonewinkel.com, hokaonlinegreece.org, hokaononemall.online, hokaoutletphilippines.com, hokaoutletsphilippines.com, hokapromocao.com, hokarebajas.com, hokarunningshoesireland.com, hokarunningshoesuk.com, hokasale.com, hokasaleaustralia.com, hokasaleireland.com, hokasalenz.com, hokasaleuk.com, hokasalg.net, hokaschoenensale.com, hokaschoenenwinkel.com, hokashoes.net, hokashoes.shop, hokashoesca.com, hokashoes-canada.com, hokashoesforwomen.com, hokashoesgr.com, hokashoesonsale.com, hokashoesoutlet.com, hokashoesphilippines.com, hokashoessalenz.com, hokashoessaleusa.com, hokashoesusa.com, hokasklep.com, hokaskonorge.com, hokaskotilbud.com, hoka-southafrica.com, hokasouthafricashop.com, hokasuomi.com, hoka-turkey.com, airmax97og.com, almhmall.com, awymall.com, bruinapparel.com, buyhokashoesaustralia.com, buyuggnz.com, cheekywitted.com, ddwwmall.com, dexcorconsultora.com, digitalpromotionacademy.com, ewymall.com, ewzjmall.com, fridajade.com, funnelgrower.com, glossfreya.com, hokogr.com, iteca-russia.com, keds-outlet.com, kerensar.com, lmwkk.com, lojahokaportugal.com, lwbmall.com, mrassir.com, naurdent.com, oaivc.com, oemtz.com, otandntataglance.com, rungmtc.com, sandyrouje.com, shades-clothing.com, sneakersaustralias.com, suckerpunchedme.com, theinfinityblogs.com, themoodyhues.com, ugg-argentina.com, vbaou.com, winterbootssaleau.com, wowespace.com, wzjmall.com, xccxmall.com, xrrxmall.com, xxbmall.com, xxdimall.com and zyfzmyyx.com added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/13/2021. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Telephonic status and motion hearing held. Plaintiff's counsel appeared telephonically. Defendants did not appear. Plaintiff's motion for entry of preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk is directed to unseal any previously sealed documents in this matter. Plaintiff is ordered to add all Defendant names listed in the Schedule A to the docket within three business days. Instructions can be found on the court's website located at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_cmecf/pdfs/v60/Add_Terminate_Instructions.pdf. In addition, is a link to video instructions for Plaintiff to view on how to Add Terminate Party https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Videos.aspx?folder=_cmecf&play=Add_Terminate.mp4Telephonic status hearing set for 1/27/22 at 9:30am. Parties shall call 866-434-5269 and the access code is 3751971. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: On the court's own motion, telephonic status and motion hearing set for 12/6/21 is stricken and re-set to 12/13/21 at 9:30am. Counsel shall call 866-434-5269; access code 3751971. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Plaintiff's motion for entry of preliminary injunction #31 is set for 12/6/21 at 9:30am to coincide with the telephonic status hearing already set for that date. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 12/1/2021, answer due 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin F. Trainor)(Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE by Deckers Outdoor Corporation re MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for preliminary injunction #31 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM by Deckers Outdoor Corporation in support of motion for preliminary injunction #31 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deckers Outdoor Corporation as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAILED Trademark Report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ma,) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, ) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 12/15/2021 (jg, ). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18833484. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DECKERS OUTDOOR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Francis Trainor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RiKaleigh C. Johnson