This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2022 at 12:31:24 (UTC).

Deckers Outdoor Corporation v. Steven Madden, LTD et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Deckers Outdoor Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Steven Madden, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05722

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deckers Outdoor Corporation

Defendants

Steven Madden, LTD

Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc.

DOES 1-10, inclusive

J. Hale, Inc. doing business as Lori's Designer Shoes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jamie Fountain

Brent H Blakely

Defendant Attorneys

Brian K. Brookey

Alexander Kaplan

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order On Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initia

18 #1

Declaration Declaration of D Miro ISO Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to I

#18

(#18) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 8, 2022 filed by Plaintiff Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc., J. Hale, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of D Miro ISO Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#17

(#17) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant J. Hale, Inc., Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#16

(#16) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to J. Hale, Inc. answer now due 10/20/2022; Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc. answer now due 10/20/2022; Steven Madden, LTD answer now due 10/20/2022; Deckers Outdoor Corporation answer now due 10/20/2022, filed by Defendant J. Hale, Inc.; Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc.; Steven Madden, LTD.(Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party J. Hale, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party Steven Madden, LTD(pty:dft))(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#15

(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Steven Madden, LTD served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Katherine Meet, Agent for Service at Cogency Global, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc. served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marisa Karanen, Agent for Service at Cogency Global Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

#13

(#13) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant J. Hale, Inc. served on 8/19/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Madden, Counsel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

11 #2

SMadden

11 #1

JHale

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc., J. Hale, Inc. and Steven Madden, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 JHale, #2 SMadden) (jtil) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#7

(#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, identifying None. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33800814 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Jamie Fountain added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 8, 2022 filed by Plaintiff Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc., J. Hale, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of D Miro ISO Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order On Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant J. Hale, Inc., Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc., Steven Madden, LTD.(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to J. Hale, Inc. answer now due 10/20/2022; Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc. answer now due 10/20/2022; Steven Madden, LTD answer now due 10/20/2022; Deckers Outdoor Corporation answer now due 10/20/2022, filed by Defendant J. Hale, Inc.; Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc.; Steven Madden, LTD.(Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party J. Hale, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexander Kaplan added to party Steven Madden, LTD(pty:dft))(Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Steven Madden, LTD served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Katherine Meet, Agent for Service at Cogency Global, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc. served on 8/23/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Marisa Karanen, Agent for Service at Cogency Global Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 09/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (pk) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant J. Hale, Inc. served on 8/19/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Madden, Counsel in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Dolce Vita Footwear, Inc., J. Hale, Inc. and Steven Madden, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 JHale, #2 SMadden) (jtil) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, identifying None. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33800814 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Jamie Fountain added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Fountain, Jamie) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less