This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2022 at 08:50:14 (UTC).

Decker v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Decker filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02785

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Decker

Defendants

Atrium Medical Corporation

Getinge AB

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles H. Johnson

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles H Johnson, PA

2599 Mississippi St

New Brighton, MN 55112

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine E. Unger Davis

Attorney at Dechert LLP

2929 Arch St

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Devine Millimet

111 Amherst Street

Manchester, NH 03101

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (MTB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) transferring case to the District of New Hampshire per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kt) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

6 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (cmp) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketMDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-2785-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (cmp) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number: 0:22-cv-01606. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-19) transferring case to the District of New Hampshire per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kt) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2753 re: #1 Complaint. (MTB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Atrium Medical Corporation, Getinge AB, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC. (MTB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docket(#2) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 22-cv-01606 PJS/BRT.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MTB) [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Atrium Medical Corporation, Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC, Getinge AB (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9584076) filed by Jennifer Decker. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Charles) Modified text on 6/21/2022 (MTB). [Transferred from mnd on 7/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atrium Medical Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Maquet Cardiovascular US, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine E. Unger Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pierre A. Chabot