This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/12/2022 at 08:02:44 (UTC).

Decker et al v. 3M Company, The et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 Decker filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02612

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas Decker

Patricia Decker

Defendants

3M Company, The

Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company

Chemguard Inc

EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company

Chemours Company FC LLC, The

Du Pont De Nemours Inc

Kidde-Fenwal Inc

Kidde PLC Inc

UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc

United Technologies Corporation

Chubb Fire LTD

Corteva Inc

Dynax Corporation

Chemours Company, The

Archroma US Inc

Carrier Global Corporation

Clariant Corporation

ChemDesign Products Inc

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robin M Primeau

Attorney at Murray Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70130

Robin M Primeau,

Attorney at Murray Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10635686.), filed by Patricia Decker, Thomas Decker. Service due by 11/7/2022(sshe, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • Docket(#3) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 8/9/2022), Decker et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2612-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Vermont (sshe, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10635686.), filed by Patricia Decker, Thomas Decker. Service due by 11/7/2022(sshe, ) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Archroma US, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Carrier Global Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Chubb Fire LTD is a litigant