This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:10:32 (UTC).

DECK v. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 DECK filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-04081

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAIME DECK

Defendants

VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC

VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC doing business as VERIZON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA

Attorney at Murphy Law Group

1628 Jfk Boulevard, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of JAIME DECK with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAIME DECK. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203251.), filed by JAIME DECK.(sg, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of JAIME DECK with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAIME DECK. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • 1 Summons Issued as to VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 9/10/2019 (sg, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JAIME DECK. (sg, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203251.), filed by JAIME DECK.(sg, ) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin D. Salvina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.