This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2022 at 22:57:42 (UTC).

Dechanique Scott v. Adecco USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Dechanique Scott filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Adecco USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00137

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dechanique Scott

Defendants

Adecco USA, Inc.

FN Logistics, LLC

Fashion Nova, LLC

Nova Fashion, Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Farrah Beverly Grant

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Mia D Farber

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Peter M Waneis

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, P.C.

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Richard B Azada

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

333 South Hope Street 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1422

Robert E Mussig, Jr

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

333 South Hope Street 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1448

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court of California, case number 21STCV44038 Receipt No: ACACDC-32583178 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Mia D Farber added to party ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Mia Farber re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Megan Guyton re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation, (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 14, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Richard B Azada on behalf of Defendants FN Logistics, LLC, Fashion Nova, LLC, Nova Fashion, Inc. (Attorney Richard B Azada added to party FN Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B Azada added to party Fashion Nova, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B Azada added to party Nova Fashion, Inc.(pty:dft))(Azada, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

13 #13

Main Document

13 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the Stipulation to Dismiss #13 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar; and 3. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Pursuant to the Stipulation to Dismiss #13 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a):IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The entire action and all claims asserted therein are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. All dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar; and 3. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Adecco USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Farber, Mia) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Richard B Azada on behalf of Defendants FN Logistics, LLC, Fashion Nova, LLC, Nova Fashion, Inc. (Attorney Richard B Azada added to party FN Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B Azada added to party Fashion Nova, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard B Azada added to party Nova Fashion, Inc.(pty:dft))(Azada, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for March 14, 2022 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Adecco USA, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/5/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION of Mia Farber #3 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Defendants Adecco USA, Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive, FN Logistics, LLC, Fashion Nova, LLC, Nova Fashion, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Dechanique Scott. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION of Mia Farber #3 ]. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation, (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Megan Guyton re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Mia Farber re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court of California, case number 21STCV44038 Receipt No: ACACDC-32583178 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Mia D Farber added to party ADECCO USA, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Farber, Mia) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less