This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 16:15:58 (UTC).

Decatur Licensing LLC v. Sony Corporation Of America

Case Summary

On May 25, 2021, Decatur Licensing LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Nicholas Netram Loaknauth of The Law Office of Nicholas Loaknauth, Esq, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Sony Corporation of America (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief, as well as damages, for the alleged infringement of the ‘476 Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Southern District of New York with Judge Gregory H. Woods presiding

 

The Plaintiff filed the complaint for the Defendant’s alleged direct infringement of United States Patent No. 9,706,476 (the “‘476 Patent” or the “Patent-in-Suit”) entitled “Method for obtaining radio access network information and radio access network controller”. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods that perform all the steps recited in at least one claim of the ‘476 Patent. More particularly, Defendant commercializes, inter alia, methods that perform all the steps recited in Claim 1 of the ‘476 Patent. Specifically, Defendant makes, uses, sells, offers for sale, or imports a method that encompasses that which is covered by Claim 1 of the ‘476 Patent.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “Defendant ha,s directly infringed and continues to directly infringe at least one claim of the ‘476 Patent by using, at least through internal testing or otherwise, the Accused Product without authority in the United States, and will continue to do so unless enjoined by this Court. As a direct and proximate result of Defendant’s direct infringement of the ‘476 Patent, Plaintiff has been and continues to be damaged.”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant offers solutions, such as the “Sony Xperia XQAT51/B” (the “Accused Product”),1 that enables a method for obtaining radio access network information. For example, the Accused Product will comply with and use the 5G standard. The 5G standard dictates a method for obtaining radio access network information.”

 

The only claim for relief laid down by the Plaintiff is for the alleged infringement of the ‘476 Patent, wherein, the Plaintiff claimed that, the Defendant has committed these acts of infringement without license or authorization, and had knowledge of infringement of the ‘476 Patent at least as of the service of the present Complaint. The Plaintiff then claimed that, by engaging in the conduct described in the complaint, Defendant has injured Plaintiff and is thus liable for infringement of the ‘476 Patent, pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 271. 



In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to adjudicate that Defendant have directly infringed the ‘476 Patent; order an accounting of all infringing sales and damages including, but not limited to, those sales and damages not presented at trial; and order that Defendant be permanently restrained and enjoined from directly infringing the ‘476 Patent. Plaintiff further requested the Court to award damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. §284 sufficient to compensate Plaintiff for the Defendant’s past infringement and any continuing or future infringement, including compensatory damages; grant prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs against Defendant; and direct the Defendant to pay enhanced damages, including Plaintiff’s costs of litigation.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04691

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Decatur Licensing LLC

Defendant

Sony Corporation Of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Netram Loaknauth

Attorney at The Law Office of Nicholas Loaknauth, Esq

1460 Broadway

New York, NY 10016

Andrew S. Curfman

Attorney at SAND, SEBOLT & WERNOW CO., LPA

4940 Munson Street, N.W.Aegis Tower - Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#11

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint., #1 Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 24, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 12. SO ORDERED. (Sony Corporation Of America answer due 8/24/2021.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/23/2021) (rro) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Sony Corporation Of America served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. Service was accepted by Kathy Krieger-Jewell, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Decatur Licensing LLC..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24659244. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Andrew S Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24659244. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support with Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/16/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/26/2021) (ate) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(pc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sony Corporation Of America..(pc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sony Corporation of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Decatur Licensing LLC..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Decatur Licensing LLC..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sony Corporation Of America. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24588897)Document filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: US Pat. No. 9,706,467, #2 Exhibit B: Claim Chart).(Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Decatur Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Netram Loaknauth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman