This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2021 at 08:54:15 (UTC).

Decatur Licensing LLC v. ASUS Computer International

Case Summary

On 01/30/2021 Decatur Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ASUS Computer International. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00761

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Decatur Licensing LLC

Defendant

ASUS Computer International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Whitefield Ritcheson

Attorney at Insight, PLC

578 Washington Boulevard, #503

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Andrew S Curfman

Attorney at Sand, Sebolt and Wernow Co., LPA

4940 Munson Street Nw, Aegis Tower - Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing

#10

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT on the determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Decatur Licensing LLC (Curfman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 3/8/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order, signed 2/5/2021, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Curfman.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew S. Curfman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15533330.) filed by Decatur Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to ASUS Computer International. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/16/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 1/30/2021) (Entered: 01/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet by Decatur Licensing LLC . (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 1/30/2021) (Entered: 01/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 1/30/2021) (Entered: 01/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Decatur Licensing LLC (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 1/30/2021) (Entered: 01/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against ASUS Computer International ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15514398.). Filed byDecatur Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 1/30/2021) (Entered: 01/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Decatur Licensing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Asus Computer International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven W Ritcheson