This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:35:52 (UTC).

Debolt et al v. Olivera et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Debolt filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Olivera. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00380

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George Debolt

Arcadia, FL 34266

Robert Williams

Arcadia, FL 34266

Defendants

Donald Sawyer

FNU Jenkins

FNU Payne

FNU Rivers

FNU Olivera

FNU Carter

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) FINANCIAL certificate by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#8

(#8) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/11/2019. (SLU) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

11 #1

Mailing Envelope

#11

(#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Williams. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by George Debolt. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

10 #1

Mailing Envelope

#9

(#9) (UNSIGNED) FINANCIAL certificate by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/11/2019. (SLU) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/11/2019. (SLU) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of indigency by Robert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

5 #1

Mailing Envelope

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 06/10/2019)

4 #1

Mailing Envelope

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of indigency by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

3 #1

Mailing Envelope

2 #1

Mailing Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 06/10/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FINANCIAL certificate by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert Williams. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by George Debolt. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (UNSIGNED) FINANCIAL certificate by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/11/2019. (SLU) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/11/2019. (SLU) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/11/2019. (SLU) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of indigency by Robert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Williams. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of indigency by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FNU Carter, FNU Jenkins, FNU Olivera, FNU Payne, FNU Rivers, Donald Sawyer with Jury Demand filed by Robert Williams, George Debolt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Mailing Envelope) (no service copies provided)(SLU) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.