This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 08:30:10 (UTC).

DeBold v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 DeBold filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11802

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jami DeBold

Defendant

Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J. Conroy

Attorney at Schwartz Law PC

Suite 900, 666 Old Country Road

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey A. Fritz

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

200 State Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 22, 2020 to File Responsive Pleading by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2020 to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Fritz on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jami DeBold. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Jami DeBold. (Conroy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

1 #2

Supplement MA Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8446052 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jami DeBold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement MA Category Form)(Conroy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to December 22, 2020 to File a Responsive pleading, (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 22, 2020 to File Responsive Pleading by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 11/30/2020. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 30, 2020 to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey A. Fritz on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (Fritz, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jami DeBold. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Jami DeBold. (Conroy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8446052 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jami DeBold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement MA Category Form)(Conroy, Matthew) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less