Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 10:09:24 (UTC).

Deanco Healthcare, LLC v. Blue Cross of California, et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Deanco Healthcare, LLC filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross of California. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and John A. Kronstadt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05662

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Deanco Healthcare, LLC

Deanco Healthcare, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Mission Community Hospital

Defendants

Blue Cross of California

Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Blue Cross of California a California corporation doing business as Anthem Blue Cross

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melanie Joy Stephenson-Laws

Attorney at Stephenson Acquisto and Colman Inc

303 North Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 700

Burbank, CA 91502

Kathy B Lin

Attorney at Stepheson Acquisto and Colman Inc

303 North Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 700

Burbank, CA 91502

Karlene Jasmine Rogers-Aberman

Attorney at Stephenson Acquisto and Colman Inc

303 North Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 700

Burbank, CA 91502-3226

Richard A Lovich

Attorney at Stephenson Acquisto and Colman Inc

303 North Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 700

Burbank, CA 91502

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Stewart Kim

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

5 Park Plaza Suite 1400

Irvine, CA 92614-2545

Tina Safi Felahi

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

11682 El Camino Real Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130

Chad R Fuller

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

11682 El Camino Real Suite 400

San Diego, CA 92130-2092

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim, Paul) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

14 #3

Proposed Order

14 #2

Declaration Evidentiary Objection to and Motion to Strike Portions of the Declar

14 #1

Declaration Declaration of Kathy Lin

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Plaintiff Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kathy Lin, #2 Declaration Evidentiary Objection to and Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Scott Hicks, #3 Proposed Order)(Lin, Kathy) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S [UNOPPOSED] EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 6 FOR ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (DKT. #12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, Plaintiff's Application is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before 8/14/2020. Defendants shall file any reply to the Opposition on or before 8/28/2020. (et) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

12 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's [Unopposed] Ex Parte App

12 #1

Declaration of Kathy B. Lin In Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Ap

#12

(#12) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Pursuant to F.R.C.P.6 To Extend Deadline To File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re Reply (Motion related) #11 filed by Plaintiff Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathy B. Lin In Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Application For Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P.6 For Order to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's [Unopposed] Ex Parte Application For Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P.6 To Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Lin, Kathy) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#11

(#11) REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 In Response to Plaintiff's Non-Opposition filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (Kim, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul Stewart Kim on behalf of Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California (Kim, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (Fuller, Chad) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/25/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (cw) (Entered: 07/05/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit A-F

7 #2

Declaration of Scott Hicks

7 #1

Declaration of Tina Felahi

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tina Felahi, #2 Declaration of Scott Hicks, #3 Exhibit A-F) (Fuller, Chad) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim, Paul) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Plaintiff Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kathy Lin, #2 Declaration Evidentiary Objection to and Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Scott Hicks, #3 Proposed Order)(Lin, Kathy) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S [UNOPPOSED] EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 6 FOR ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (DKT. #12 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, Plaintiff's Application is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file its Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before 8/14/2020. Defendants shall file any reply to the Opposition on or before 8/28/2020. (et) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from Pursuant to F.R.C.P.6 To Extend Deadline To File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re Reply (Motion related) #11 filed by Plaintiff Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathy B. Lin In Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Application For Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P.6 For Order to Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's [Unopposed] Ex Parte Application For Relief Pursuant to F.R.C.P.6 To Extend Deadline to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) (Lin, Kathy) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 In Response to Plaintiff's Non-Opposition filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (Kim, Paul) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul Stewart Kim on behalf of Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California (Kim, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. (Fuller, Chad) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/25/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (cw) (Entered: 07/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California. Motion set for hearing on 12/7/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tina Felahi, #2 Declaration of Scott Hicks, #3 Exhibit A-F) (Fuller, Chad) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (droj) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Blue Cross of California, Does, filed by plaintiff Deanco Healthcare, LLC. (filed in state court 3/30/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 9) (esa) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS, (Fuller, Chad) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Fuller, Chad) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV12525 Receipt No: ACACDC-26955291 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Scott Hicks) (Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Chad R Fuller added to party BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS(pty:dft))(Fuller, Chad) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA... is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE CROSS OF CALIFORNIA dba ANTHEM BLUE CROSS is a litigant