This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2021 at 11:29:56 (UTC).

Dean v. Tyson Foods Inc

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Dean filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tyson Foods Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. Truncale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Truncale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janice Dean

Defendant

Tyson Foods Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vuk S Vujasinovic

Attorney at Vujasinovic & Beckcom, PLLC

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Edward Johnson, II

Attorney at Mayer LLP - Dallas

750 N. St. Paul Street, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75201

Zachary Thomas Mayer

Attorney at Mayer LLP - Dallas

750 N. St. Paul Street, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Edward Johnson, II on behalf of Tyson Foods Inc (Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before March 11, 2021. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on April 5, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., via telephone. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/18/21. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. For effective disposition of cases in the Eastern District of Texas, this Lufkin civil case is hereby transferred from Judge Ron Clark to Judge Michael Truncale. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 2/17/21. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#5

(#5) Original ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Tyson Foods Inc.(Mayer, Zachary) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janice Dean. Tyson Foods Inc served on 1/20/2021, answer due 2/10/2021. (Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Tyson Foods Inc. and emailed back to Attorney in Charge for service. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tyson Foods Inc, filed by Janice Dean.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljw, ). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

1 #1

Summons(es)

#1

(#1) PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY TO REFILE COMPLAINT Original against Tyson Foods Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8188887.), filed by Janice Dean. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(Vujasinovic, Vuk) Modified on 1/11/2021 (ljw, ). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Edward Johnson, II on behalf of Tyson Foods Inc (Johnson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING CIVIL ACTION FOR RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference on or before March 11, 2021. The case is SET for a Rule 16 Case Management Conference on April 5, 2021 at 2:00 p.m., via telephone. Signed by District Judge Michael J. Truncale on 2/18/21. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn no longer assigned to case. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. For effective disposition of cases in the Eastern District of Texas, this Lufkin civil case is hereby transferred from Judge Ron Clark to Judge Michael Truncale. Signed by District Judge Ron Clark on 2/17/21. (ljw, ) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Original ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Tyson Foods Inc.(Mayer, Zachary) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Janice Dean. Tyson Foods Inc served on 1/20/2021, answer due 2/10/2021. (Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Tyson Foods Inc. and emailed back to Attorney in Charge for service. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tyson Foods Inc, filed by Janice Dean.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljw, ). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Ron Clark. (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 1, Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE. Attorney must refile the complaint as an amended complaint making sure to correct the case number and attach a civil cover sheet. Attorney must also email the summons to the Clerk for the Clerk to issue them. Summons are NOT to be attached to the complaint.*** (ljw, ) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY TO REFILE COMPLAINT Original against Tyson Foods Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8188887.), filed by Janice Dean. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(Vujasinovic, Vuk) Modified on 1/11/2021 (ljw, ). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tyson Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vuk Stevan Vujasinovic