This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2019 at 07:37:22 (UTC).

Dean v. Biomet, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 Dean filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Biomet, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Douglas Harpool. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03245

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Douglas Harpool

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arnold Dean

Defendants

Biomet Orthopedics, LLC

Biomet, Inc.

Biomet Manufacturing, LLC

Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Schnieders

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik

6731 W. 121St St., Suite 201

Overland Park, KS 66209

Defendant Attorneys

Michael F. Smith

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Tulsa

Two W. Second Street, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Robert C. Gallup

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Des Moines

801 Grand Avenue, 33Rd Floor

Des Moines, IA 50309

Valerie L Dixon

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Tulsa

Two W. Second Street, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Emalie L Rott

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Tulsa

Two W. Second Street, Suite 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Stephanie A Koltookian

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels LLP - Des Moines

801 Grand Avenue, 33Rd Floor

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Affidavit of Service

15 #3

Affidavit of Service

15 #1

Affidavit of Service

#15

(#15) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Arnold Dean. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019; Biomet, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Schnieders, Christopher) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit List of Courts Admitted to Practice

#11

(#11) Motion to allow Emalie L. Rott to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6448813) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#9

(#9) Motion to allow Michael F. Smith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6446181) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Courts Admitted to Practice)(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#12

(#12) Motion to allow Stephanie A. Koltookian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6449197) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#13

(#13) Motion to allow Robert C. Gallup to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6449208) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

10 #1

MAP General Order

#8

(#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/26/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/11/2019. Signed on 8/12/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet, Inc..(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet Orthopedics, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet Manufacturing, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Arnold Dean. Biomet Orthopedics, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019; Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019; Biomet, Inc. served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Affidavit of Service)(Schnieders, Christopher) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #9 , #11 , #12 , #13 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michael F. Smith, Emalie Rott, Stephanie A Koltookian and, Robert C. Gallup for defendants allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Motion to allow Robert C. Gallup to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6449208) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Motion to allow Stephanie A. Koltookian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6449197) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion to allow Emalie L. Rott to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6448813) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Motion to allow Michael F. Smith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6446181) filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Courts Admitted to Practice)(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/26/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 9/11/2019. Signed on 8/12/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet, Inc..(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet Orthopedics, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of Defendant Biomet Manufacturing, LLC.(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of appearance by Valerie L Dixon on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet Manufacturing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet Orthopedics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie L Dixon added to party Biomet, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dixon, Valerie) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • SUMMONSES ISSUED (4) as to Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. and emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service. (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher Schnieders on behalf of arnold dean. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6393742. Service due by 10/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schnieders, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/10/2019) (Siegert, Karen). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.