This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2019 at 07:59:03 (UTC).

DEAN BROTHERS PUMPS, INC. et al v. AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 DEAN BROTHERS PUMPS, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04118

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

DEAN BROTHERS PUMPS, INC.

MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

MET-PRO CORPORATION

CECO ENVIRONMENTAL CORP.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN HOME ASSURANCE COMPANY

HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY

FIRST STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

INDIANA INSURANCE COMPANY

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY

EXCESS INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Frederick D. Emhardt

Attorney at EMHARDT LAW LLC

1905 South New Market Street, Suite 267

Carmel, IN 46032

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Scott A. Harkness

Attorney at NORRIS CHOPLIN & SCHROEDER LLP

101 West Ohio Street, Ninth Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Bradley J. Wombles

Attorney at NORRIS CHOPLIN & SCHROEDER

101 W. Ohio St., 9Th Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46207

Michael R. Orlando

Attorney at COHN BAUGHMAN & SERLIN

333 West Wacker Drive, Suite 900

Chicago, IL 60606

Jeffrey B. Fecht

Attorney at RILEY BENNETT EGLOFF LLP

500 N. Meridian Street, Suite 550

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Phillip K. Beth

Attorney at HINKHOUSE WILLIAMS WALSH, LLP

180 North Stetson Street, Suite 3400

Chicago, IL 60637

Thomas D. Ferguson

Attorney at KARBAL, COHEN, ECONOMOU, SILK & DUNNE, LLC

150 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60606

John Carl Trimble

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Michael Robert Giordano

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Meghan Eileen Ruesch

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

James P. Ruggeri

Attorney at SHIPMAN & GOODWIN, LLP

1875 K Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

Myles D. Morrison

Attorney at SHIPMAN & GOODWIN LLP

1875 K. St. Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006-1251

 

Court Documents

#51

50 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#50

49 #2

Exhibit No.2 American Dec Pages

49 #1

Exhibit No.1 Great American Dec Pages

#49

#48

31 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#31

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

State Court Record Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summonses

1 #4

Exhibit Complaint for Declaratory Judgment-State Court

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - CECO Public Information Report

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - CECO 10-K

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Med Tech's Corporate Disclosure Statement

#1

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ORDER granting #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to the Complaint fourteen days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs' motion to remand to state court. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/27/2019. (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) MOTION for Extension of Time to 14 days after entry of Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, filed by Defendant FIRST STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) REPLY in Support of Motion re #31 MOTION to Remand to State Court , filed by Plaintiffs CECO ENVIRONMENTAL CORP., DEAN BROTHERS PUMPS, INC., MET-PRO CORPORATION, MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No.1 Great American Dec Pages, #2 Exhibit No.2 American Dec Pages)(Emhardt, Frederick) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint - The CNA Companies' response and Excess's response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due fourteen (14) days after the Court rules on the motion to remand to state court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/25/2019. (JRB) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Declaration of Michael R. Orlando, filed by Defendant FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Insurance Company Excess Liability Policy Number 7928-53-44)(Orlando, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint , filed by Defendant FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Orlando, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendant FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Orlando, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, filed by Defendants CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, EXCESS INSURANCE COMPANY LIMITED, HARBOR INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint)(Beth, Phillip) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION to Remand to State Court , filed by Defendant GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Defendant, The American Insurance Company (incorrectly sued as Firemans Fund Insurance Company), filed by FIREMANS FUND INSURANCE COMPANY.(Fecht, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Harkness on behalf of Defendant FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Harkness, Scott) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEAN BROTHERS PUMPS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent CECO ENVIRONMENTAL CORP., Corporate Parent MET-PRO CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Met-Pro Technologies, LLC for DEAN BROTHERS PUMPS, INC... (Emhardt, Frederick) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick D. Emhardt on behalf of Plaintiffs CECO ENVIRONMENTAL CORP., DEAN BROTHERS PUMPS, INC., MET-PRO CORPORATION, MET-PRO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Emhardt, Frederick) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORRECTED NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Eileen Ruesch on behalf of Defendant GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Ruesch, Meghan) Modified on 10/7/2019 (NAD). (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN FINANCIAL GROUP for GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Trimble, John) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Giordano on behalf of Defendant GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Eileen Ruesch on behalf of Defendant GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Ruesch, Meghan) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Carl Trimble on behalf of Defendant GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Trimble, John) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court 6, case number 49D06-1909-PL-039843, filed by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5663850) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Med Tech's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Exhibit 2 - CECO 10-K, #3 Exhibit 3 - CECO Public Information Report, #4 Exhibit Complaint for Declaratory Judgment-State Court, #5 State Court Record Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summonses, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trimble, John) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDIANA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Excess Insurance Company Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where First State Insurance Company is a litigant