Deal Genius, LLC v. O2COOL, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: In response to defendant's motion to dismiss count II of the original complaint, plaintiff exercised its right, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), to amend count II. Plaintiff also filed a response to the pending motion to dismiss (No. #19 ) in which plaintiff states that it amended count II to avoid the cost of motion practice. Plaintiff maintains that count II of the original complaint satisfied federal pleading standards. Because the amendment alters count II, defendant's motion (No. #12 ) to dismiss count II of the original complaint is denied as moot. See Macklin v. Butler, 553 F.2d 525, 528 (7th Cir. 1977) (per curiam). Defendant has until and including 6/22/2021 to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's second amended complaint. A joint initial status report remains due on or before 6/18/2021.Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE by Deal Genius, LLCin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant O2COOL, LLC #12 (Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to counterclaim and affirmative defenses by Deal Genius, LLC(Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED complaint by Deal Genius, LLC against O2COOL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 7,828,524)(Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendant's motion (No. #12 ) to dismiss count II of plaintiff's complaint is briefed as follows: response due: 6/4/2021; reply due: 6/18/2021. Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by O2COOL, LLC against Deal Genius, LLC [CORRECTED filing to replace ECF 13]. by O2COOL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parks, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LR 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by O2COOL, LLC (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by O2COOL, LLC against Deal Genius, LLC . by O2COOL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parks, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant O2COOL, LLC (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant O2COOL, LLC by Sartouk H. Moussavi (Moussavi, Sartouk) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant O2COOL, LLC by Michael Anthony Parks (Parks, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deal Genius, LLC as to O2COOL, LLC on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: An initial status report and, if appropriate, case management plan is due on or before June 18, 2021. The parties are directed to consult Judge Gottschall's website for specific requirements for all written status reports and for the discovery plans. In conformity with the Tenth Amended General Order 20-12 and due to the need for social distancing during the COVID-19 pandemic, this court is ordering written status reports instead of routine oral status hearings. This includes initial status hearings and scheduling conferences under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). See Judge Gottschall's website for the procedure for requesting a hearing. No Rule 26(f) discovery plan should be submitted until all defendants have been served. If all defendants have not been served by the deadline for filing an initial status report, the report should so state and propose a deadline for filing a discovery plan. The parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 4/19/2021.Mailed notice(mjc, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mc, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant O2COOL, LLC (crl, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (as, ) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Claims Involving a Patent by Deal Genius, LLC (Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Deal Genius, LLC (Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deal Genius, LLC by William Butler Berndt (Berndt, William) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deal Genius, LLC by Ron N. Sklar (Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Deal Genius, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18131797. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 7,828,524)(Sklar, Ron) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less