This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:22:14 (UTC).

De Well Container Shipping, Inc. v. M/V Maersk Essen et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 De Well Container Shipping, Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against M/V Maersk Essen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colleen McMahon and Gabriel W. Gorenstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00372

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

Referral Judge

Gabriel W. Gorenstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

De Well Container Shipping, Inc.

Defendants

Jiamoa International Ship Lease Company Limited

Maersk A/S

MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A.

M/V Maersk Essen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ari Gatoff

Attorney at Giuliano McDonnell & Perrone, LLP

170 Old Country Road, Suite 608

Mineola, NY 11501

Joseph John Perrone

Attorney at Giuliano McDonnell & Perrone, LLP

170 Old Country Road, Suite 608

Mineola, NY 11501

Defendant Attorneys

Edward P. Flood

Attorney at Lyons & Flood, LLP

The Towers, Suite 206, 111 Great Neck Road

Great Neck, NY 11021

Jon Werner

Attorney at Lyons & Flood LLP

111 Great Neck Road, Suite 206

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#1

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Perrone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perrone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-306. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Perrone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari Gatoff on behalf of De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Gatoff, Ari) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#17

(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULING ORDER in case 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG; granting (29) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:21-cv-11213-CM; granting (15) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00139-CM; granting (22) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00155-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00194-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00196-CM; granting (15) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00265-CM; granting (22) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00284-CM; granting (14) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00366-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00370-CM; granting (17) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00388-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the following cases are administratively consolidated, at present for pre-trial purposes only, under the Master Case Number 21-cv-08183- which is the first filed of these cases- under the rubric "In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases:" 21 cv-08183, 21-cv-08334, 21-cv-10857, 21-cv-11171, 21-cv-11173, 21-cv-11176, 21-cv-11213, 22-cv-00139, 22-cv-00148, 22-cv-00155, 22-cv-00 194, 22 cv-00196, 22-cv-00265, 22-cv-00284, 22-cv-00306, 22-cv-00366, 22-cv-00370, 22-cv-00372, 22-cv-00374, 22-cv-00386, 22-cv-00388, 22-cv-00445, 22 cv-00460, 22-cv-00461, 22-cv-00766, 22-cv-01499. And it is further ORDERED, that the caption to be used for as long as this order is operative shall be as follows: as further set forth herein. And it is further 21 CV 08183 (CM) (GWG) ORDERED, that motions filed in connection with specific cases must be posted to ECF under both the Master Case Number and the civil action number assigned to the individual case; and it is further ORDERED, that if any party to this litigation becomes aware of a case that should be consolidated into the matter known as In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases, that party shall notify the court immediately; and it is further ORDERED, that if for any reason any subsequently-filed case cannot be consolidated into In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases, including but not limited to because of a conflict of interest on the part of the presiding District or Magistrate Judge that is both unwaivable and incurable, or if such a conflict develops in any of the cases already consolidated by virtue of this order, all reasonable efforts will be made to coordinate proceedings before any other assigned judge with proceedings in In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases; and it is further ORDERED, that the only cases to be consolidated as part of In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases are cases brought by or in right of shippers who lost cargo on this voyage, and that other types of cases that may arise out of this voyage, including specifically disputes between shippers and insurers over insurance coverage for cargo lost on this voyage, will not be deemed to be related cases and will not be handled as part of this consolidated action; and Sufficient cause appearing therefore, it is further ORDERED, that the civil case management conference currently scheduled for March 3, 2022, is adjourned, at the request of the parties (see Civ. No. 21 cv 11213, at Dkt. No. 29) to facilitate settlement discussions and the possible coordination of discovery. The case management conference will be held before Judges McMahon and Gorenstein on April 25, 2022 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 24A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. The parties are advised that the court will not further adjourn this conference.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/2/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al. (kv) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#18

(#11) NOTICE of Related Cases Omitted from Consolidation Order re: (17 in 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG) Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#19

(#12) AMENDED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULING ORDER re: (31 in 1:22-cv-00461-CM-GWG, 17 in 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG, 15 in 1:21-cv-08334-CM-GWG, 10 in 1:21-cv-11176-CM-GWG, 18 in 1:22-cv-00196-CM, 18 in 1:22-cv-00370-CM, 12 in 1:22-cv-00766-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00139-CM, 10 in 1:21-cv-11171-CM-GWG, 16 in 1:22-cv-00366-CM, 16 in 1:22-cv-00386-CM-GWG, 25 in 1:22-cv-00284-CM, 22 in 1:22-cv-00148-CM-GWG, 11 in 1:22-cv-00445-CM-GWG, 32 in 1:21-cv-11213-CM, 24 in 1:22-cv-00155-CM, 10 in 1:21-cv-11173-CM-GWG, 7 in 1:22-cv-01499-CM, 17 in 1:21-cv-10857-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00265-CM, 16 in 1:22-cv-00306-CM-GWG, 18 in 1:22-cv-00194-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00374-CM, 10 in 1:22 cv-00372-CM-GWG, 6 in 1:22-cv-00460-CM, 19 in 1:22-cv-00388-CM) Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that 22-cv-00439, 22-cv-00487 and 22-cv-494 be and are added to the list of consolidated cases, and that all terms of said March 2, 2022 order shall apply to said cases. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/4/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al. (kv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#6

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiamoa International Ship Lease Company Limited, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Maersk A/S. (vf) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. waiver sent on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Gatoff, Ari) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#13

(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Werner, Jon) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jon Werner on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Werner, Jon) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Flood, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULING ORDER re: (31 in 1:22-cv-00461-CM-GWG, 17 in 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG, 15 in 1:21-cv-08334-CM-GWG, 10 in 1:21-cv-11176-CM-GWG, 18 in 1:22-cv-00196-CM, 18 in 1:22-cv-00370-CM, 12 in 1:22-cv-00766-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00139-CM, 10 in 1:21-cv-11171-CM-GWG, 16 in 1:22-cv-00366-CM, 16 in 1:22-cv-00386-CM-GWG, 25 in 1:22-cv-00284-CM, 22 in 1:22-cv-00148-CM-GWG, 11 in 1:22-cv-00445-CM-GWG, 32 in 1:21-cv-11213-CM, 24 in 1:22-cv-00155-CM, 10 in 1:21-cv-11173-CM-GWG, 7 in 1:22-cv-01499-CM, 17 in 1:21-cv-10857-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00265-CM, 16 in 1:22-cv-00306-CM-GWG, 18 in 1:22-cv-00194-CM, 17 in 1:22-cv-00374-CM, 10 in 1:22 cv-00372-CM-GWG, 6 in 1:22-cv-00460-CM, 19 in 1:22-cv-00388-CM) Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that 22-cv-00439, 22-cv-00487 and 22-cv-494 be and are added to the list of consolidated cases, and that all terms of said March 2, 2022 order shall apply to said cases. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/4/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al. (kv) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Related Cases Omitted from Consolidation Order re: (17 in 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG) Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES AND SCHEDULING ORDER in case 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG; granting (29) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:21-cv-11213-CM; granting (15) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00139-CM; granting (22) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00155-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00194-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00196-CM; granting (15) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00265-CM; granting (22) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00284-CM; granting (14) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00366-CM; granting (16) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00370-CM; granting (17) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference( Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon.) in case 1:22-cv-00388-CM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that the following cases are administratively consolidated, at present for pre-trial purposes only, under the Master Case Number 21-cv-08183- which is the first filed of these cases- under the rubric "In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases:" 21 cv-08183, 21-cv-08334, 21-cv-10857, 21-cv-11171, 21-cv-11173, 21-cv-11176, 21-cv-11213, 22-cv-00139, 22-cv-00148, 22-cv-00155, 22-cv-00 194, 22 cv-00196, 22-cv-00265, 22-cv-00284, 22-cv-00306, 22-cv-00366, 22-cv-00370, 22-cv-00372, 22-cv-00374, 22-cv-00386, 22-cv-00388, 22-cv-00445, 22 cv-00460, 22-cv-00461, 22-cv-00766, 22-cv-01499. And it is further ORDERED, that the caption to be used for as long as this order is operative shall be as follows: as further set forth herein. And it is further 21 CV 08183 (CM) (GWG) ORDERED, that motions filed in connection with specific cases must be posted to ECF under both the Master Case Number and the civil action number assigned to the individual case; and it is further ORDERED, that if any party to this litigation becomes aware of a case that should be consolidated into the matter known as In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases, that party shall notify the court immediately; and it is further ORDERED, that if for any reason any subsequently-filed case cannot be consolidated into In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases, including but not limited to because of a conflict of interest on the part of the presiding District or Magistrate Judge that is both unwaivable and incurable, or if such a conflict develops in any of the cases already consolidated by virtue of this order, all reasonable efforts will be made to coordinate proceedings before any other assigned judge with proceedings in In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases; and it is further ORDERED, that the only cases to be consolidated as part of In re: Maersk Essen Voyage 051 Shipper Cases are cases brought by or in right of shippers who lost cargo on this voyage, and that other types of cases that may arise out of this voyage, including specifically disputes between shippers and insurers over insurance coverage for cargo lost on this voyage, will not be deemed to be related cases and will not be handled as part of this consolidated action; and Sufficient cause appearing therefore, it is further ORDERED, that the civil case management conference currently scheduled for March 3, 2022, is adjourned, at the request of the parties (see Civ. No. 21 cv 11213, at Dkt. No. 29) to facilitate settlement discussions and the possible coordination of discovery. The case management conference will be held before Judges McMahon and Gorenstein on April 25, 2022 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 24A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse. The parties are advised that the court will not further adjourn this conference.. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/2/2022) BY ECF TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG et al. (kv) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-cv-08183-CM-GWG.. (kv) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. waiver sent on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Gatoff, Ari) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jiamoa International Ship Lease Company Limited, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Maersk A/S. (vf) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Jed S. Rakoff as possibly related to 1:22-cv-306. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph John Perrone. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M/V Maersk Essen, MSC MEDITERRANEAN SHIPPING COMPANY S.A. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ari Gatoff on behalf of De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Gatoff, Ari) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-306. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Perrone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perrone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Perrone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jiamoa International Ship Lease Company Limited, M/V Maersk Essen, MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Maersk A/S. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25589646)Document filed by De Well Container Shipping, Inc...(Perrone, Joseph) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jiamoa International Ship Lease Company Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where De Well Container Shipping, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon Werner