This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:31:23 (UTC).

De Luna v. Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 De Luna filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02082

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vincent A De Luna

Defendant

Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Guinness I Ohazuruike

Attorney at Guiness Law Firm

6845 W. Charleston Blvd, Ste A

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Defendant Attorneys

Paige S. Shreve

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Ste. 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Bruce C Young

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Boulevard, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 3/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Suite 3005 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered directly to my chambers, U.S. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, in a sealed envelope-MARKED CONFIDENTIAL AND DO NOT FILE, not later than 4:00 p.m., February 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/1/2020.(Young, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center. (JM) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vincent A De Luna. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ohazuruike, Guinness) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) First STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center. (Young, Bruce) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent HCA Healthcare, Inc. for Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center added. (Young, Bruce) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Stipulation; Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5800409) by Vincent A De Luna. Proof of service due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ohazuruike, Guinness) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/1/2020.(Young, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent HCA Healthcare, Inc. for Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center added. (Young, Bruce) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Stipulation; Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 3/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Suite 3005 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered directly to my chambers, U.S. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, in a sealed envelope-MARKED CONFIDENTIAL AND DO NOT FILE, not later than 4:00 p.m., February 24, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center. (Young, Bruce) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vincent A De Luna. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ohazuruike, Guinness) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center. (JM) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Southern Hills Hospital and Medical Center (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5800409) by Vincent A De Luna. Proof of service due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ohazuruike, Guinness) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.