This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2021 at 08:54:32 (UTC).

De Leon v. Delacan, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 De Leon filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Delacan, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01445

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward De Leon

Defendant

Delacan, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alanna Klein Fischer

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, Suite 250, 34555 Chagrin Boulevard

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Anthony J Lazzaro

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, Suite 250, 34555 Chagrin Boulevard

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Don J. Foty

Attorney at Hodges & Foty, LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

Lori M Griffin

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, Suite 250, 34555 Chagrin Boulevard

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Esther C Rodriguez

Attorney at Rodriguez Law Offices, PC

10161 Park Run Drive, Suite 150

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Lori Marie Griffin

Attorney at The Lazzaro Law Firm, LLC

The Heritage Building, 34555 Chagrin Blvd. Suite 250

Moreland Hills, OH 44022

Defendant Attorney

Allison List Kheel

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

300 S Fourth Street, Suite 1500

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Delacan, LLC answer due 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER Granting #15 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Delacan, LLC answer due 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request) re #16 Order on Stipulation, by Defendant Delacan, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Delacan, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori M Griffin for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alanna Klein Fischer for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony J Lazzaro for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lori M. Griffin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599226) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#10

(#10) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alanna Klein Fischer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599219) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony J. Lazzaro and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599193) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Don J. Foty for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/5/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Don J. Foty and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6583369) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Edward De Leon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Delacan, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Delacan, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6581594) by Edward De Leon. Proof of service due by 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rodriguez, Esther) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/03/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER Granting #17 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Delacan, LLC answer due 10/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request) re #16 Order on Stipulation, by Defendant Delacan, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Granting #15 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Delacan, LLC answer due 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION Stipulation and Order to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Delacan, LLC. (List Kheel, Allison) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori M Griffin for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alanna Klein Fischer for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony J Lazzaro for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lori M. Griffin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599226) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alanna Klein Fischer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599219) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anthony J. Lazzaro and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6599193) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Don J. Foty for Edward De Leon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Esther C Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/5/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #6 . Document not on Court approved form. The form is available on the Court's website: www.nvd.uscourts.govAttorney Esther Rodriguez is advised to file the corrected image using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #6 . Do not use the event "Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition" as it will charge the filer another $250. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Don J. Foty and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Esther C. Rodriguez (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6583369) by Plaintiff Edward De Leon. (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Edward De Leon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rodriguez, Esther) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Alanna Klein Fischer, Anthony J Lazzaro, Don J. Foty, and Lori M Griffin to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/17/2021. (no image attached) (MR) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Delacan, LLC re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Delacan, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6581594) by Edward De Leon. Proof of service due by 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Rodriguez, Esther) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison List Kheel