This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 08:18:12 (UTC).

De La Torre v. State Farm LLoyds

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 De La Torre filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm LLoyds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02178

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert De La Torre

Defendant

State Farm LLoyds

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Paul Barmore

Attorney at Zerbe Miller Fingeret Frank & Jadav LLP

3009 Post Oak Blvdsuite 1700

Houston, TX 77056

Scott G Hunziker

Attorney at Zerbe Miller Fingeret Frank & Jadav PC

3009 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77056

Anna Dean Kamins

Attorney at Zerbe Miller Fingeret Frank & Jadav PC

3009 Post Oak Blvdsuite 1700

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Michael C Klein

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

Ashley S Bunyard

Attorney at Dykema Gossett PLLC

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 1800

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E

1 #6

Exhibit(s) F

1 #7

Cover Sheet

1 #8

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm LLoyds. (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/20/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Paul Barmore on behalf of Robert De La Torre. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barmore, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Paul Barmore on behalf of Robert De La Torre. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Barmore, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/20/2021) (ygl) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm LLoyds. (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by State Farm LLoyds. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12214961) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Klein, Michael) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Lloyds as Subrogee of Bryan Dietzel is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashley Shapiro Bunyard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Klein