This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 06:41:08 (UTC).

De La Rosa v. Choice Hotels International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 De La Rosa filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Choice Hotels International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01638

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAVIER DE LA ROSA

Defendants

CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ADP, LLC

L-O CHICAGO OPERATING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Patrick Kingsbury

Attorney at McGuire Law, P.C.

55 W. Wacker Dr., 9Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60601

William P. N. Kingston

Attorney at Mcguire Law, P.c.

55 W. Upper Wacker Dr., Floor 9

Chicago, IL 60601

Jad Sheikali

Attorney at McGuire Law, P.C.

55 West Wacker Drive, 9Th Fl.

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Bonnie Keane DelGobbo

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

191 N. Wacker Dr., Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

Maria Ann Boelen

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606-2841

Joel Griswold

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

200 S. Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801

Precious Stephanie Jacobs

Attorney at Jenner And Block LLP

353 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Ross Benjamin Bricker

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

David Charles Layden

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Reanne Zheng

Attorney at Jenner & Block, Llp

353 N Clark St.

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#61

(#61) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: A notice of voluntary dismissal has been filed. This case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending dates before this court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#60

(#60) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Javier De La Rosa (Sheikali, Jad) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#59

(#59) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for further extension of time to respond to plaintiff's second amended complaint #57 is granted to 1/24/2020. Status hearing previously set for 1/23/2020 is stricken and reset for 2/24/2020 at 9:45 a.m. No appearance required on 1/16/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#58

(#58) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #57 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/16/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#57

(#57) MOTION by Defendant ADP, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #45 / Defendant ADP, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Layden, David) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#56

(#56) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to second amended complaint #54 is granted to 1/10/2020. Status hearing previously set for 1/13/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/23/2020 at 9:45 a.m. No appearance required on 1/9/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#55

(#55) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #54 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/9/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#54

(#54) MOTION by Defendant ADP, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #45 - Defendant ADP, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Layden, David) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#45

(#54) MOTION by Defendant ADP, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #45 - Defendant ADP, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Layden, David) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 is granted to 4/12/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP due 4/30/2019. The Report must conform to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The form of the Report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. No appearance required on 3/13/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#5

(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019-CH-01258) filed by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15569022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL Cover Sheet (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: A notice of voluntary dismissal has been filed. This case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending dates before this court are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Javier De La Rosa (Sheikali, Jad) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for further extension of time to respond to plaintiff's second amended complaint #57 is granted to 1/24/2020. Status hearing previously set for 1/23/2020 is stricken and reset for 2/24/2020 at 9:45 a.m. No appearance required on 1/16/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #57 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/16/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MOTION by Defendant ADP, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #45 / Defendant ADP, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Further Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Layden, David) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to second amended complaint #54 is granted to 1/10/2020. Status hearing previously set for 1/13/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/23/2020 at 9:45 a.m. No appearance required on 1/9/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE of Motion by David Charles Layden for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #54 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/9/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Layden, David) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION by Defendant ADP, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding amended complaint #45 - Defendant ADP, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Layden, David) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADP, LLC by Reanne Zheng (Zheng, Reanne) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ADP, LLC by Precious Stephanie Jacobs (Jacobs, Precious) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 is granted to 4/12/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP due 4/30/2019. The Report must conform to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The form of the Report can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. No appearance required on 3/13/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 3/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, ) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019-CH-01258) filed by CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15569022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC. by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL Cover Sheet (DelGobbo, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Choice Hotels International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. N. Kingston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jad Sheikali