This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2022 at 08:27:53 (UTC).

DCCC v. Kosinski et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 DCCC filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against Kosinski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01029

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DCCC

Defendants

KRISTEN ZEBROWSKI-STAVISKY

Peter S. Kosinski

Douglas A. Kellner

New York, NY 10016

Andrew J. Spano

Anthony J. Casale

Todd D. Valentine

Intervenor Defendants

Republican National Committee

National Republican Congressional Committee

New York Republican State Committee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nairuby L. Beckles

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

600 Fifth Avenue 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Andrew G. Celli

Attorney at Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady, LLP

600 Fifth Avenue 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Elisabeth C. Frost

Attorney at Elias Law Group LLP

10 G Street Ne, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20002

Defendant Attorneys

Seth Jonathan Farber

Attorney at New York State Office of the Attorney General

28 Liberty Street

New York, NY 10005

Douglas A. Kellner

Attorney at Kellner Herlihy Getty & Friedman LLP

470 Park Avenue South - 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Intervenor Defendant Attorney

Paul Derohannesian

Attorney at Derohannesian & Derohannesian

159 Wolf Road, Suite 305

Albany, NY 12205

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew J. Spano, Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Kristen Zebrowski-Stavisky, Peter S. Kosinski, Todd D. Valentine..(Farber, Seth) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#39

(#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Jonathan Farber on behalf of Andrew J. Spano, Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Kristen Zebrowski-Stavisky, Peter S. Kosinski, Todd D. Valentine..(Farber, Seth) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

38 #2

Proposed Answer of Intervenors

38 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene

38 #38

Main Document

#36

(#36) MOTION for Tyler Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#33

>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Graham White to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#32

>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Marc Erik Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nairuby L. Beckles on behalf of DCCC..(Beckles, Nairuby) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#9

(#9) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#8

(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kristen Zebrowski-Stavisky, in her official capacity as Co- Executive Director of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Todd D. Valentine, in his official capacity as Co-Executive Director of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony J. Casale, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew J. Spano, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Douglas A. Kellner, in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter S. Kosinski, in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#1

(#40) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew J. Spano, Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Kristen Zebrowski-Stavisky, Peter S. Kosinski, Todd D. Valentine..(Farber, Seth) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew J. Spano, Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Kristen Zebrowski-Stavisky, Peter S. Kosinski, Todd D. Valentine..(Farber, Seth) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth Jonathan Farber on behalf of Andrew J. Spano, Anthony J. Casale, Douglas A. Kellner, Kristen Zebrowski-Stavisky, Peter S. Kosinski, Todd D. Valentine..(Farber, Seth) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) FIRST MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Republican National Committee, National Republican Congressional Committee, New York Republican State Committee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Answer of Intervenors).(Derohannesian, Paul) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER granting #36 Motion for Tyler Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #36 MOTION for Tyler Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Tyler Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting #33 Motion for Graham White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #32 Motion for Marc Erik Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Graham White to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #32 MOTION for Marc Erik Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nairuby L. Beckles on behalf of DCCC..(Beckles, Nairuby) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kristen Zebrowski-Stavisky, in her official capacity as Co- Executive Director of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Todd D. Valentine, in his official capacity as Co-Executive Director of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony J. Casale, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrew J. Spano, in his official capacity as Commissioner of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Douglas A. Kellner, in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter S. Kosinski, in his official capacity as Co-Chair of the State Board of Elections, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANTHONY J CASALE, DOUGLAS A KELLNER, PETER S KOSINSKI, ANDREW J SPANO, TODD D VALENTINE, KRISTEN ZEBROWSKI-STAVISKY. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25690156)Document filed by DCCC..(Celli, Andrew) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCCC is a litigant