This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 11:09:34 (UTC).

D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. L.F. JENNINGS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 D C TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against L F JENNINGS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01126

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

JOHNSON DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATES, INC.

1015 15Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

L.F. JENNINGS, INC.

JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC

JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant, Counter Defendant and Cross Claimant

JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC

3Rd Party Defendants and Counter Claimants

BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC

POWERS BROWN ARCHITECTURE OF VIRGINIA, LLC

3Rd Party Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Claimants

JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC

JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC

Defendant and Cross Defendant

L.F. JENNINGS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tram T. Pham

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Curtis Aaron Boykin

Attorney at DOUGLAS & BOYKIN PLLC

1850 M Street Nw, Suite 640

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff, Cross Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Debolina Das

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP

The Atlantic Building, 950 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1404

Beth Patricia Evans

Attorney at KRAMON & GRAHAM PA

One South Street, Suite 2600

Baltimore, MD 21202

Brian S. Goodman

Attorney at Kramon & Graham, P.A.

One South Street, Suite 2600

Baltimore, MD 21202

3Rd Party Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Stephan F. Andrews

Attorney at VANDEVENTER BLACK, LLP

707 East Main Street, Suite 1700

Richmond, VA 23218

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Beth Patricia Evans

Attorney at KRAMON & GRAHAM PA

One South Street, Suite 2600

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC (Andrews, Stephan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

30 #1

Memorandum in Support

#30

(#30) MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Third-Party Complaint by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Andrews, Stephan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#29

(#29) ANSWER to #21 Third Party Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC. Related document: #21 Third Party Complaint, filed by JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC, JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Andrews, Stephan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#28

(#28) RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#27

(#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian S. Goodman, :Firm- Kramon & Graham, P.A., :Address- One South Street, Suite 2600. Phone No. - 410-752-6030. Fax No. - 410-539-1269 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6213693. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Brian S. Goodman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

21 #2

Summons POWERS BROWN ARCHITECTURE OF VIRGINIA, LLC SUMMONS

21 #1

Summons BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC SUMMONS

#21

(#29) ANSWER to #21 Third Party Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC. Related document: #21 Third Party Complaint, filed by JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC, JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Andrews, Stephan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tram T. Pham on behalf of D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Documents from Superior Court Action

#3

(#3) ERRATA Revised Notice of Removal Pursuant to LCVR 5.1(c) by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Documents from Superior Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Documents from Superior Court Action

#1

(#8) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to the Clerk and Supplement to the Record on Removal filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim Against LFJ, #2 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC (Andrews, Stephan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION to Dismiss Count V of Third-Party Complaint by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Andrews, Stephan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ANSWER to #21 Third Party Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC by BOHLER ENGINEERING VA, PLLC. Related document: #21 Third Party Complaint, filed by JSF 2ND STREET NE CMPI, LLC, JSF MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Andrews, Stephan) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Case STAYED was entered in error. Discovery only is STAYED until further Order of the Court. (znbn) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Stayed until further Order of the Court. (znbn) Modified on 7/2/2019 (znbn). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 7/2/2019. Discovery to be STAYED until further Order of the Court. Status Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25A before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (znbn) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct entry (znbn). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's scheduling conference, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Discovery is STAYED until further Order of the Court, although the parties may continue to voluntarily exchange initial disclosures; and 2) The parties shall return for a status conference on January 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/2/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of BRIAN S. GOODMAN. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/26/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brian S. Goodman, :Firm- Kramon & Graham, P.A., :Address- One South Street, Suite 2600. Phone No. - 410-752-6030. Fax No. - 410-539-1269 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6213693. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Brian S. Goodman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Crossclaim Answer to Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Cross-Claim [8-1] by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth); Modified text and added docket entry relationship on 5/2/2019 (tth). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to the Clerk and Supplement to the Record on Removal filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim Against LFJ, #2 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE to the Clerk and Supplement to the Record on Removal by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim Against LFJ, #2 Exhibit Johnson Development Associates, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. (Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by L.F. JENNINGS, INC..(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tram T. Pham on behalf of D.C. TEACHERS' FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Pham, Tram) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ERRATA Revised Notice of Removal Pursuant to LCVR 5.1(c) by L.F. JENNINGS, INC. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Documents from Superior Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Beth) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal, (zef, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019CA001848b Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-6071745 filed by L.F. JENNINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Documents from Superior Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Beth) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/22/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.