This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2023 at 15:21:03 (UTC).

D.B. v. Sullivan, MD et al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 D B filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sullivan, MD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mae A. D'Agostino and Christian F. Hummel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D.B.

Defendants

Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD

Rossana Rosado

John Does 1-5

Jane Does 1-5

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amy L Bellantoni

Attorney at The Bellantoni Law Firm, PLLC

2 Overhill Road, Suite 400

Scarsdale, NY 10583

Defendant Attorney

Melissa A. Latino

Attorney at New York State Attorney General - Albany

Albany, Ny 12224

Albany, NY 12224

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Rossana Rosado, Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD. (hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/17/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by D.B. re #1 Complaint, proceeding under a pseudonym (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym, Memorandum of Law in Support served on NYS Office of Attorney General on March 31, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint with Exhibits served on Ann Marie Sullivan and NYS Office of Mental Health on April 1, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet served on Rossana Rosado and Division of Criminal Justice Services on April 1, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym, Memorandum of Law in Support, Letter to the Court dated March 24, 2022 served on NYS Attorney General on March 25, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#10

(#10) Pre-Motion Letter by Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 4/25/2022 (Latino, Melissa) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#11

(#11) LETTER BRIEF in response to Defendants' pre-motion letter by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Jane Does 1-5, John Does 1-5, Rossana Rosado, Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNYNDC-5847175) filed by D.B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ATF Form 4473, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mental Hygiene Law Admissions Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - ATF Form 4473

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Mental Hygiene Law Admissions Process

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Motions to be filed by 6/1/2022. (ban) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketTEXT Minute Entry for Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 5/2/2022 before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino: Appearances by Amy Bellatoni, Esq. for the plaintiff; Melissa Latino, AAG for defendant Sullivan; The status of defendant Rosado's representation is still TBD. Judge D'Agostino addresses counsel regarding the defendant's pre-motion letter. Judge D'Agostino addresses counsel regarding some of the issues she sees at this point in time - counsel are encouraged to research and discuss the issues raised by the Court. If the defense still feels that a motion to dismiss is warranted, the defendant may file their motion on or before 6/1/22. If the motion to dismiss is filed - Response papers will be due on or before 6/22/22; Reply papers will be due by 6/29/22. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson, CRD Britney Norton [Time 10:00 a.m. - 10:12 a.m.]) (ban) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER BRIEF in response to Defendants' pre-motion letter by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pre-Motion Letter by Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 4/25/2022 (Latino, Melissa) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Rossana Rosado answer due 4/22/2022; Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD answer due 4/22/2022. (hmr) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym, Memorandum of Law in Support, Letter to the Court dated March 24, 2022 served on NYS Attorney General on March 25, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint with Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet served on Rossana Rosado and Division of Criminal Justice Services on April 1, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint with Exhibits served on Ann Marie Sullivan and NYS Office of Mental Health on April 1, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Verified Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym, Memorandum of Law in Support served on NYS Office of Attorney General on March 31, 2022, filed by D.B.. (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by D.B. re #1 Complaint, proceeding under a pseudonym (Bellantoni, Amy) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant(s) and Jane Doe defendant(s) in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe defendant(s) or Jane Doe defendant(s) at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendant(s) and Jane Doe defendant(s), plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Docket(#4) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/24/2022 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/17/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Rossana Rosado, Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD. (hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jane Does 1-5, John Does 1-5, Rossana Rosado, Ann Marie T. Sullivan, MD (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNYNDC-5847175) filed by D.B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ATF Form 4473, #2 Exhibit 2 - Mental Hygiene Law Admissions Process, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less