This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2019 at 07:21:28 (UTC).

DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Esther Salas and Michael A. Hammer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01484

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.

Defendants

HAROLD WALLS

KARL WALLS

CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLY ANN KRUG

Attorney at Connell Foley

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

BRYAN PAUL COUCH

Attorney at Connell Foley

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

BRIA S. BEAUFORT

Attorney at CONNELL FOLEY LLP

56 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068

Defendant Attorneys

KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN

Attorney at GENOVA BURNS LLC

494 Broad Street

Newark, NJ 07102

LAWRENCE BLUESTONE

Attorney at Genova Burns LLC

30 Montgomery Street, 11Th Floor

Jersey City, NJ 07302

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. KARL WALLS served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE BLUESTONE on behalf of CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#10

(#10) CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND re #7 Defendants' Letter. The time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/8/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9345675), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN on behalf of All Defendants (EINHORN, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIA S. BEAUFORT on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (BEAUFORT, BRIA) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#7

(#7) Letter from Lawrence Bluestone, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by BRIA S. BEAUFORT on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (BEAUFORT, BRIA) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND re #7 Defendants' Letter. The time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 4/8/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/2019. (dam, ) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN BARNETT EINHORN on behalf of All Defendants (EINHORN, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by LAWRENCE BLUESTONE on behalf of CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS (BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Lawrence Bluestone, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(BLUESTONE, LAWRENCE) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. KARL WALLS served on 2/13/2019, answer due 3/6/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CLARE PROPERTIES, LLC, KARL WALLS, HAROLD WALLS ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9345675), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less