This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:18:25 (UTC).

DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. v. AARNA HOSPITALITY, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against AARNA HOSPITALITY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are James B. Clark and Kevin McNulty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06219

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James B. Clark

Presiding Judge

Kevin McNulty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.

Defendants

BENITA CHAUDHARI

MULJIBHAI CHAUDHARI

AARNA HOSPITALITY, INC.

BENITABEN CHAUDHARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KELLY ANN KRUG

Attorney at Connell Foley

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

BRYAN PAUL COUCH

Attorney at Connell Foley

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Boulevard, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR.

Attorney at CONNELL FOLEY

One Newark Center, 1085 Raymond Blvd, 19Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AARNA HOSPITALITY, INC., BENITA CHAUDHARI, MULJIBHAI CHAUDHARI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9431156), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. BENITA CHAUDHARI served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (GATTONI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AARNA HOSPITALITY, INC., BENITA CHAUDHARI, BENITABEN CHAUDHARI, MULJIBHAI CHAUDHARI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. BENITA CHAUDHARI served on 4/9/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AARNA HOSPITALITY, INC., BENITA CHAUDHARI, BENITABEN CHAUDHARI, MULJIBHAI CHAUDHARI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (JB, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (ak, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. GATTONI, JR on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (GATTONI, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY ANN KRUG on behalf of DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. (KRUG, KELLY) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying WYNDHAM HOTEL GROUP, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against AARNA HOSPITALITY, INC., BENITA CHAUDHARI, MULJIBHAI CHAUDHARI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9431156), filed by DAYS INNS WORLDWIDE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(COUCH, BRYAN) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.