This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 08:06:38 (UTC).

Day v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Day filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sue E. Myerscough and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03008

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sue E. Myerscough

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer L. Day

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

CSS-Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Sutterfield

Attorney at SUTTERFIELD LAW OFFICES

208 S 2Nd, Po Box 836

Effingham, IL 62401

Defendant and Interested Party Attorney

US ATTY-SPRINGFIELD SSA

Attorney at generic ssa account

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation (SEE ATTACHED). Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 01/23/2020. (SKN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#10

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service Executed by Jennifer L. Day as to Commissioner of Social Security. (SKN, ilcd) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT CONSENT UNREDACTED (SKN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 01/29/2020. (SKN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Klein, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Sutterfield, David) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(SKN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation (SEE ATTACHED). Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 01/23/2020. (SKN, ilcd) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David Sutterfield on behalf of Jennifer L. Day (Sutterfield, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer L. Day. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Sutterfield, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer L. Day. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interest, #3 Summons, #4 USM-285 Forms)(Sutterfield, David) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.