This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2020 at 12:10:21 (UTC).

Dawson v. Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Dawson filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara A. McAuliffe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara A. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torres Dawson

Defendant

Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Lisa Ann Stilson

Attorney at Roll Law Group, P.C.

11444 West Olympic Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor Torres Dawson signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/23/2020. Hearing set for 6/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

5 #3

Proposed Order

5 #2

Declaration

5 #1

Memorandum

#5

(#5) EX PARTE APPLICATION by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC for Order Scheduling Judgment Debtor Examination and to Produce Documents. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC re #3 Writ Issued, #2 Application for Writ of Execution, #1 Registration of Foreign Judgment. (Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

(#3) WRIT of EXECUTION ISSUED. (Flores, E) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

2 #2

Application to tax cost

2 #1

Writ of Execution

#2

(#2) APPLICATION for WRIT of EXECUTION by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Execution, #2 Application to tax cost)(Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#1

(#1) REGISTRATION of FOREIGN JUDGMENT by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. Attorney Stilson, Lisa Ann added.(Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor Torres Dawson signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/23/2020. Hearing set for 6/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EX PARTE APPLICATION by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC for Order Scheduling Judgment Debtor Examination and to Produce Documents. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC re #3 Writ Issued, #2 Application for Writ of Execution, #1 Registration of Foreign Judgment. (Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WRIT of EXECUTION ISSUED. (Flores, E) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for WRIT of EXECUTION by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Execution, #2 Application to tax cost)(Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Registration of Foreign Judgment. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REGISTRATION of FOREIGN JUDGMENT by Wonderful Pistachios and Almonds LLC. Attorney Stilson, Lisa Ann added.(Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $ 47, receipt number 0972-8699628. (Stilson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant