This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:15 (UTC).

Dawson v. Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Dawson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc , d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John H England, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00755

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John H England, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy Jones Dawson

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian M Clark

Attorney at WIGGINS CHILDS PANTAZIS FISHER & GOLDFARB

The Kress Building, 301 19Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203-3204

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua B Baker

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 6Th Avenue North, Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jeffrey M Grantham

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

Amsouth Harbert Plaza, Suite 2400, 1901 6Th Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203-2618

Joshua R Hess

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

1901 Sixth Avenue North Suite 2400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Stay RULE 26 OBLIGATIONS AND DISCOVERY by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation, filed by Tracy Jones Dawson.(Clark, Brian) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Respond to Motion to Dismiss Motion is RIPE 6/27/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Clark, Brian) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/22/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#15

(#15) First MOTION to Amend/Correct 2nd Motion to Amend Complaint by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Clark, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 8/5/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 8/5/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 7/19/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit C

#16

(#16) Opposition to re #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2019-900319.00., filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TEXT ORDER setting motion deadline re #15 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 2nd Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. Any opposition is due by July 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 7/15/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Opposition to re #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) First MOTION to Amend/Correct 2nd Motion to Amend Complaint by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Clark, Brian) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss, (doc. 7), is due by July 12, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by July 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/27/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Respond to Motion to Dismiss Motion is RIPE 6/27/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Tracy Jones Dawson. (Clark, Brian) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion to Stay.The parties' Rule 26(f) obligations are stayed through the consent deadline of August 5, 2019. If the parties consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction, the undersigned will leave the stay in place until there is a ruling on the pending motion to dismiss. If consent is not entered, the district judge to whom this case is reassigned will reevaluate the stay upon receiving the case and may or may not leave the stay in place beyond the consent deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/25/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Regarding Compliance with Rule 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than 8/5/2019. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after 8/5/2019. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on 7/19/2019. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/25/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Unopposed MOTION to Stay RULE 26 OBLIGATIONS AND DISCOVERY by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. Plaintiff's response is due by July 3, 2019. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by July 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/19/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation, filed by Tracy Jones Dawson.(Clark, Brian) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 5/22/2019. (CDG) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 5/22/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation (Hess, Joshua) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $400, receipt_number (ALND B4601097791) 1126-3349552. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2019-900319.00., filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AFS). (Hess, Joshua) Modified on 5/20/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AFS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2019-900319.00., filed by Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.