This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:46:25 (UTC).

DAWBER v. DART CONTAINER CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 DAWBER filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against DART CONTAINER CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-06021

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY DAWBER

Defendants

DART CONTAINER CORPORATION

DART CONTAINER CORPORATION doing business as DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF PENNSYLVANIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENJAMIN DAVID SALVINA

Attorney at Murphy Law Group

1628 Jfk Boulevard, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

FARA ASHLEY COHEN

Attorney at POST & SCHELL, P.C.

1600 John F Kennedy Blvd.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SIDNEY R. STEINBERG

Attorney at POST & SCHELL PC

Four Penn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheets

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIMOTHY DAWBER. DART CONTAINER CORPORATION waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (SALVINA, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by FARA ASHLEY COHEN on behalf of DART CONTAINER CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(COHEN, FARA) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by SIDNEY R. STEINBERG on behalf of DART CONTAINER CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(STEINBERG, SIDNEY) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of TIMOTHY DAWBER with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 12/20/19. 12/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket1 Summons Issued as to DART CONTAINER CORPORATION. Forwarded To: Mailed to Counsel on 12/20/2019 (nd, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by TIMOTHY DAWBER. (nd, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DART CONTAINER CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE208633.), filed by TIMOTHY DAWBER. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheets)(nd, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dart Container Corporation of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin D. Salvina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.