This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2020 at 10:07:41 (UTC).

Davis v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Henry E. Hudson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00637

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry E. Hudson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francis Davis

Frances Davis

Defendant

Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Albert Davis Bugg, III

Attorney at Rumsey & Bugg

4421 Irvington Rd, Po Box 720

Irvington, VA 22480

Albert Davis Bugg, Jr.

Attorney at Rumsey & Bugg

4421 Irvington Rd, Po Box 720

Irvington, VA 22480

Defendant Attorneys

Karissa Thomas Kaseorg

Attorney at McCandlish Holton PC

1111 E Main St, Suite 2100, Po Box 796

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.

Attorney at McCandlish Holton PC

1111 E Main St, Suite 2100, Po Box 796

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Jury Trial set for 4/27/2021 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/2/2020) (rpiz) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Cameron Beck, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Beck, Donald) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

6 #1

Pretrial Schedule A

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Frances Davis. (Bugg, Albert) (text modified on 10/2/2020 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name - rpiz) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Davis Bugg, Jr on behalf of Frances Davis (Bugg, Albert) (text modified on 10/2/2020 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name - rpiz) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Kaseorg, Karissa) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Kaseorg, Karissa) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B, Defendant's Answer

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Complaint

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7356455.), filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Defendant's Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaseorg, Karissa) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketSet Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Jury Trial set for 4/27/2021 at 9:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/2/2020) (rpiz) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Cameron Beck, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Beck, Donald) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketInitial Pretrial Conference held on 10/1/2020 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Frances Davis. (Bugg, Albert) (text modified on 10/2/2020 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name - rpiz) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Davis Bugg, Jr on behalf of Frances Davis (Bugg, Albert) (text modified on 10/2/2020 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name - rpiz) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Kaseorg, Karissa) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Kaseorg, Karissa) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7356455.), filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Defendant's Answer, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaseorg, Karissa) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. is a litigant