This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 07:56:55 (UTC).

Davis v. Wag Labs Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Davis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wag Labs Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eileen S Willett and Susan R Bolton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01086

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Eileen S Willett

Susan R Bolton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sir Lawrence Davis

Defendants

JD Kemper

David Cane

Unknown Parties

Wag Labs Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher Robert Houk

Attorney at Houk Law Firm PLLC

1050 E Southern Ave., Ste. A3

Tempe, AZ 85282

Defendant Attorneys

Kristy Leah Peters

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

Yijee Jeong

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 900

Phoenix, AZ 85016-2907

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

#3

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for September 16, 2021 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 502, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/16/21. (MAW) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wag Labs Incorporated. (Peters, Kristy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David Cane, JD Kemper, Wag Labs Incorporated.(Peters, Kristy) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended to and including August 13, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/23/21. (MAW) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Wag Labs Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jeong, Yijee) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1086-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#6) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to David Cane, JD Kemper, Wag Labs Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19595004. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1086-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Sir Lawrence Davis. (Houk, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19595004 filed by Sir Lawrence Davis. (Houk, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAG LABS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Robert Houk