This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 13:20:35 (UTC).

Davis v. United Church Homes Management, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United Church Homes Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lanita Ford Davis

Defendants

United Church Homes Management, Inc.

United Church Homes, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek Dewayne Hopson, Jr.

Attorney at HOPSON LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 266

Clarksdale, MS 38614

Derek D. Hopson

Attorney at HOPSON LAW GROUP

P.O. Box 266, Martin Luther King Blvd.

Clarksdale, MS 38614

Defendant Attorneys

Robert P. Thompson

Attorney at MCANGUS, GOUDELOCK & COURIE, LLC

P.O. Box 2955, 1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 706 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158

Erica Jo Lloyd

Attorney at MCANGUS GOUDELOCK & COURIE, LLC

317 Heritage Drive, Suite 3

Oxford, MS 38655

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #4

Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

6 #3

Summons

6 #2

Summons

6 #1

State Court Complaint

#6

#5

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/30/2020. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 12/6/2021 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 12/31/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 1/29/2021. Daubert Motions due by 4/22/2021 and Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/29/2020. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2020. (irw) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Erica Jo Lloyd on behalf of United Church Homes Management, Inc., United Church Homes, Inc.. (Lloyd, Erica)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by United Church Homes Management, Inc., United Church Homes, Inc.. (Lloyd, Erica)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Lanita Ford Davis. (Hopson, Derek)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Erica Jo Lloyd on behalf of United Church Homes Management, Inc., United Church Homes, Inc.. (Lloyd, Erica)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Lloyd, Erica)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 State Court Record - Removal: Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Lloyd, Erica)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2020 at 11:00 AM ibefore Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/28/2020. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by United Church Homes Management, Inc., United Church Homes, Inc.. (Lloyd, Erica)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against United Church Homes Management, Inc., United Church Homes, Inc., filed by Lanita Ford Davis. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Church Homes Management, Inc., United Church Homes, Inc. from Coahoma County Circuit Court, case number 14-CI-2020-004. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1810185) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by United Church Homes Management, Inc., United Church Homes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek D. Hopson