This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:21:00 (UTC).

Davis v. The Kroger Co.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The Kroger Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Akiko Davis

Defendant

The Kroger Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee Bynum Perkins

Attorney at Lee B. Perkins, Attorney at Law

3715 Northside Parkway Nw

Building 100, SU 500

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew G. Moffett

Attorney at Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 1700 - Salesforce Tower Atlanta

Atlanta, GA 30326

Sean T. Herald

Attorney at Gray, Rust, St. Amand, Moffett & Brieske, LLP

950 East Paces Ferry Road, Suite 1700 - Salesforce Tower Atlanta

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit attachments A-D

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Akiko Davis.(Perkins, Lee) Modified on 2/15/2022 to add text (rlh). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Per the request of the parties, this case is assigned to an eight-month discovery period. Discovery ends on 10/4/2022. Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/10/2022. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#9

(#9) Initial Disclosures by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#7

(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Kroger Co.. (Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 03/07/22-03/10/22, 04/20/22-04/22/22, 04/25/22, 05/23/22-05/27/22, 05/30/22, 06/09/22-06/10/22, 06/13/22, 07/25/22-07/26/22, by Matthew G. Moffett. (Moffett, Matthew) Modified on 2/10/2022 to edit text. (cmd). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/26/22. (bnw) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 13, 2022-June 27, 2022, by Lee Bynum Perkins. (Perkins, Lee) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Akiko Davis Change of Address (Perkins, Lee) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

2 #1

Jury Demand

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Exhibit -C

1 #2

Exhibit -B

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNOTICE: Effective immediately, all communications related to cases assigned to Judge Boulee should be directed to 404-215-1410 or CRD_JPB@gand.uscourts.gov. (lwb) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Initial Disclosures by Akiko Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit attachments A-D)(Perkins, Lee) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Akiko Davis.(Perkins, Lee) Modified on 2/15/2022 to add text (rlh). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Per the request of the parties, this case is assigned to an eight-month discovery period. Discovery ends on 10/4/2022. Dispositive motions due by 11/3/2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/10/2022. (cmd) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Disclosures by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Kroger Co..(Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Kroger Co.. (Herald, Sean) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 03/07/22-03/10/22, 04/20/22-04/22/22, 04/25/22, 05/23/22-05/27/22, 05/30/22, 06/09/22-06/10/22, 06/13/22, 07/25/22-07/26/22, by Matthew G. Moffett. (Moffett, Matthew) Modified on 2/10/2022 to edit text. (cmd). (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 1/26/22. (bnw) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 13, 2022-June 27, 2022, by Lee Bynum Perkins. (Perkins, Lee) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Akiko Davis Change of Address (Perkins, Lee) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Kroger Co.. Discovery ends on 6/21/2022. (Filed 11/5/21 in State COurt and included with Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Kroger Co.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11526824) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Defendant 1st Request for Admissions, #2 Exhibit -B - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's 1st Request, #3 Exhibit -C - All Pleadings Filed in Cobb County State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Thomas Herald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew G. Moffett